Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-13125

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Joan N Feeney
Case #: 1:17-ap-01147
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2017
Terminated:Feb 16, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Derrick Hobson
8 Woodville Park
Boston, MA 02119
Represented By
Derrick Hobson
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory Hobson
10 Woodville Park
Boston, MA 02119
Represented By
Michael Van Dam
Van Dam Law LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, February 16, 2018
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 02/16 9:49 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 17-1147 Settled Complaint. (chy)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/16 9:50 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-1147 Closed (chy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2018
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 02/02 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/01/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Motion to Compromise
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compromise Tue 01/30 2:48 PM
Order dated 1/30/2018 Re:14 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson, Defendant Derrick Hobson for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Request for Transfer of Order Voiding Transfer. ALLOWED. (chy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/09 4:34 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Compromise,17 Notice of Objection Deadline Set
Tuesday, January 02, 2018
21 21 order Court's Order of Deficiency Tue 01/02 2:24 PM
Court's Order of Deficiency Related [+]. The deadline to cure the deficiency is 1/9/2018 at 04:30 PM. (chy)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Compromise filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson, Defendant Derrick Hobson,17 Notice of Objection Deadline Set
Thursday, December 07, 2017
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 12/08 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion to Withdraw Document
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 12/08 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion for Lis Pendens
Tuesday, December 05, 2017
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/05 3:40 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-] 17 Notice of Objection Deadline Set
17 17 court Notice of Objection Deadline - All (JNF form 3) Tue 12/05 3:22 PM
Notice of Objection Deadline Set: Objections due by 12/29/2017 at 04:30 PM. Related [+]. (chy)
Related: [-] 14 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson, Defendant Derrick Hobson for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Request for Transfer of Order Voiding Transfer
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Document Tue 12/05 1:41 PM
Endorsed Order dated 12/5/2017 Re:13 Motion filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson to Withdraw Document and Cancel Hearing [Re:3 Expedited Motion filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson for Lis Pendens]. ALLOWED. (chy)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Lis Pendens Tue 12/05 1:38 PM
Endorsed Order dated 12/5/2017 Re:3 Expedited Motion filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson for Approval of Memorandum of Lis Pendens. WITHDRAWN. THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR DECEMBER 7, 2017 IS CANCELED. (chy)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Compromise Tue 12/05 1:26 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson, Defendant Derrick Hobson for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Request for Transfer of Order Voiding Transfer. (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
13 13 motion Withdraw Document Tue 12/05 10:36 AM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson to Withdraw Document and Cancel Hearing [Re:3 Expedited Motion filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson for Lis Pendens] with certificate of service. (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2017
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Sat 12/02 12:51 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/01/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Notice to Pro Se Parties
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Sat 12/02 12:51 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/01/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Hearing Scheduled
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 11:14 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-] 8 Affidavit/Declaration,9 Affidavit/Declaration
9 9 misc Affidavit Wed 11/29 11:10 AM
Verification of Gregory Hobson Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
8 8 misc Affidavit Wed 11/29 11:08 AM
Affidavit of Gregory Hobson Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Lis Pendens
7 7 notice Notice to Pro Se Parties Wed 11/29 10:24 AM
Notice to Pro Se Parties (McLeod, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Wed 11/29 10:18 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Lis Pendens
5 5 court Hearing Scheduled (Forms Attached) Wed 11/29 10:10 AM
Hearing Scheduled for 12/7/2017 at 01:00 PM at Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 Re:3 Expedited Motion filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson for Approval of Memorandum of Lis Pendens. Objections due by 12/6/2017 at 12:00 PM. (sl)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 11/29 8:40 AM
Summons Service Executed on Derrick Hobson 11/29/2017 (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Lis Pendens Wed 11/29 8:34 AM
Expedited Motion filed by Plaintiff Gregory Hobson for Approval of Memorandum of Lis Pendens with certificate of service. (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 11/29 7:42 AM
Summons Issued on Derrick Hobson Answer Due 12/29/2017. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (chy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/28 4:17 PM
Adversary case 17-01147 Complaint by Gregory Hobson against Derrick Hobson. Fee Amount $0.00. Nature of Suit(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))(Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-]