Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen J Murphy, III
Referred: Mona K Majzoub
Case #: 2:17-cv-13849
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2017
Terminated:Sep 20, 2018
Last checked: Monday May 28, 2018 4:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Frank Czapski
Represented By
John E. Fitzgerald
Garan Lucow Miller, P.C.
contact info
John J. Gillooly
Garan Lucow
contact info
Defendant
Jacqueline Noonan
Represented By
John E. Fitzgerald
Garan Lucow Miller, P.C.
contact info
John J. Gillooly
Garan Lucow
contact info
Defendant
Utica City
Represented By
John E. Fitzgerald
Garan Lucow Miller, P.C.
contact info
John J. Gillooly
Garan Lucow
contact info
Plaintiff
Randall Plante
Represented By
Nanette L. Cortese
contact info
Plaintiff
Vincent Ranelli
Represented By
Nanette L. Cortese
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, September 20, 2018
18 18 1 pgs order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Thu 09/20 2:03 PM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 19, 2018
17 17 2 pgs order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 09/19 12:38 PM
STIPULATED ORDER Dismissing Defendants, Jacqueline Noonan and Frank Czapski terminated. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 03, 2018
16 16 1 pgs notice Notice - Other Fri 08/03 1:54 PM
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Facilitation (Cortese, Nanette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 01, 2018
order Text-Only Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 08/01 9:37 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Extending Scheduling Order Dates re9 Scheduling Order, ( Discovery due by 10/5/2018 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off Reset for 10/26/2018 ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 23, 2018
15 15 2 pgs order Order Mon 07/23 10:44 AM
ORDER Referring Case to Facilitation. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 26, 2018
minutes Status Conference Tue 06/26 12:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/26/2018. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
14 14 2 pgs notice Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 06/25 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney John E. Fitzgerald for on behalf of All Defendants. (Fitzgerald, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
13 13 1 pgs notice Appear* Tue 05/29 3:26 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 6/26/2018 11:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III . (DPar)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 05/29 3:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/29/2018. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
12 12 2 pgs order Order Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/30 11:14 AM
ORDER Adjourning Telephonic Status Conference re8 Notice to Appear, ( TELEPHONIC Status Conference Reset for 5/29/2018 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 15, 2018
11 11 8 pgs trial Witness List Thu 03/15 12:36 PM
WITNESS LIST by All Defendants (Fitzgerald, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
10 10 4 pgs trial Witness List Wed 03/14 1:09 PM
Plaintiffs' Initial WITNESS LIST by All Plaintiffs (Cortese, Nanette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
9 9 2 pgs order Scheduling Order Wed 01/31 11:30 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/23/2018 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/21/2018 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III , Jury Trial set for 1/22/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. Related [+] (DPar)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
8 8 1 pgs notice Appear* Wed 01/31 10:46 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 4/30/2018 09:30 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III . (DPar)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 01/31 10:37 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Scheduling Conference held on 1/31/2018. (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (DPar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2018
7 7 3 pgs notice Appearance Thu 01/25 8:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Fitzgerald on behalf of All Defendants. (Fitzgerald, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
6 6 6 pgs misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Wed 01/24 4:18 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Gillooly, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2018
5 5 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/04 8:34 AM
ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, ( Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2018 09:30 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2018
4 4 13 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/03 1:02 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance Upon Jury Demand by Frank Czapski, Jacqueline Noonan, Utica City. (Gillooly, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
3 3 notice Appearance Tue 12/19 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Gillooly on behalf of Frank Czapski, Jacqueline Noonan, Utica City. (Gillooly, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
2 2 6 pgs service Summons Issued* Wed 11/29 4:23 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Frank Czapski, Jacqueline Noonan, Utica City* (Krause, S)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 11/29 3:14 PM
COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6496628 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Cortese, Nanette)
Related: [-]