Hughes v. Zuuk Downtown Dadeland et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert N Scola, Jr |
Referred: | Edwin G Torres |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-24340 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 30, 2018 5:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bentley Holdings, LLC
317 71st Street
Miami Beach, FL 33141 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hestia Food Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SV Pincho Brickell, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Laffa Mediterranean Grill Brickell, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
P24, LLC
1250 South Miami Ave Spaces 2 and 3
Miami, FL 33130 |
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Hughes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
53 | 53
4
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 04/25 8:54 AM
ORDER APPROVING CONSENT DECREE, DISMISSING CASE and any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/24/2018. (lk) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
52 | 52
order
Order
Mon 04/23 9:50 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court extended the deadline for the parties to file the appropriate dismissal filing to April 13, 2018 after receiving notice that one of the Defendants was incorrectly named. The parties failed to file the required filing by that date, and instead filed50 a joint notice of their consent decree and moved for the Court's approval and entry of the consent decree50 ,51 . The filed consent decree references an "Exhibit A" but no exhibit is attached. Further, the parties did not provide the Court with a courtesy copy of the consent decree in Word format. Accordingly, the parties are directed to submit a Word version of the consent decree with any relevant attachments to the Court by April 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/23/2018. (vgn) |
|
Saturday, April 21, 2018 | ||
51 | 51
motion
Approve Consent Judgment
Sat 04/21 9:45 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Christopher Hughes. Responses due by 5/7/2018(Udell, Maury) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B- proposed order approving consent decree |