Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Jane Triche Milazzo
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:17-cv-14004
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2017
Terminated:Jul 27, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday May 30, 2018 4:31 AM CDT
Defendant
Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Defendant
Hospira, Inc.
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Defendant
Sun Pharma Global FZE
Defendant
Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff
Charnae Morrison
Represented By
John Hamilton Gomez
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info
Ahmed S. Diab
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info
Lindsay Rene Stevens
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
6 6 7 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 07/27 1:40 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/18/2022. (Filed at Doc. 14430 in MDL 2740) (sa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 22, 2018
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 05/22 10:35 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2017
4 4 30+ pgs order Order ~Util - Create Case Association Thu 12/14 11:16 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 12/14 8:20 AM
Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (am)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2017
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Mon 12/04 12:22 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/01 12:09 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC f/k/a Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. f/k/a Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6505850) filed by Charnae Morrison.Attorney Ahmed S. Diab added to party Charnae Morrison(pty:pla).(Diab, Ahmed)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons