Davies v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-14031 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 30, 2018 4:41 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Anita Davies
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Aventis Pharma S.A.
Terminated: 01/04/2018
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
Terminated: 01/04/2018
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 26, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
order
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
Thu 04/28 10:35 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice by Anita Davies. Filed at Rec. Doc. 14116 in 16-md-2740.(ko) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 05/22 10:49 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
30+
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Wed 12/20 9:07 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/14 10:39 AM
Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (sbs) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 12/04 3:11 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (sek) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/01 1:51 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6505978) filed by Anita Davies.Attorney David Melville Peterson added to party Anita Davies(pty:pla).(Peterson, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons |