New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Burton R Lifland
Case #: 1:08-bk-14818
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2008
Terminated:Dec 20, 2012

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. AssetsMore than $1 billion
Est. Liabilities More than $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Bally Total Fitness of Greater New York, Inc.
8700 W Bryn Mawr Ave Ste 2
Chicago, IL 60631-3507
Represented By
Paul B. O'Neill
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info
Stephen Zide
Kramer Levin Naftalis And Frankel, LLP
contact info
Kenneth H. Eckstein
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info
Lyle Shapiro
Richaman Greer, P.A.
contact info
R. Joseph Decker
Mendes & Mount LLP
contact info
Jordan Kaye
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info
Steven J. Reisman
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Bally Total Fitness of Greater New York, Inc., et al.,
One Bryant Park
New York, NY 10036
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
United States Trustee
contact info

GPO Apr 07 2009
Written Opinion/Memorandum Decision and Order signed on 4/7/2009 Denying: 1) Motion For Order To Allow Class Proof Of Claim By The Carrera Class Claimants; 2) Motion By The Carrera Class Claimants For Order Lifting The Automatic Stay, Or In The Alternative, For Class Certification; And 3) Creditor Francisco Flores Motion For Class Certification (related document(s)603, 717, 664). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, March 13, 2017
2049 2049 misc Letter Thu 03/23 12:24 PM
Letter regaring letter by Bertha L. Thomas, Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-]