WILDERNESS SOCIETY et al v. DONALD J. TRUMP et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Tanya S Chutkan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02587 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 33:1365 Environmental Matters |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 02, 2018 5:47 AM EDT |
Amicus
STATE OF UTAH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RYAN ZINKE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BRIAN STEED
|
Represented By
|
Movant
UTAH FARM BUREAU FEDERATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
KANE COUNTY, UTAH
|
Represented By
|
Movant
GARFIELD COUNTY, UTAH
|
Represented By
|
Movant
AMERICAN FARM BUREAU FEDERATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SOCIETY OF VERTEBRATE PALEONTOLOGY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GRAND STAIRCASE ESCALANTE PARTNERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILDERNESS SOCIETY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SIERRA CLUB
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GREAT OLD BROADS FOR WILDERNESS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GRAND CANYON TRUST
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
198 | 198
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/19 12:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen K. Kaiser on behalf of STATE OF UTAH (Kaiser, Stephen) |
|
notice
Notice of Error
Tue 03/19 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR regarding197 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. The following error(s) need correction: Notice of withdrawal must be signed and filed by the withdrawing attorney and signed by the party/parties represented (LCvR 83.6(b)). (zjm) |
||
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
197 | 197
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Fri 03/15 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF UTAH. Attorney Melissa A. Holyoak terminated. (Davis, Kathy) |