Original Case: 4:09-cv-00527

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:13-cv-05006
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2013
Terminated:Sep 03, 2014
Last checked: Saturday Sep 05, 2015 1:11 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
GREGORY R. STIDHAM, Judge of the District Court of the Muscogee (Creek) Nation
Represented By
George William Rice
G. William Rice, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KATHLEEN SUPERNAW, Chief Justice of the Muscogee (Creek) Nation Supreme Court
Defendant - Appellee
RICHARD LERBLANCE, Chief Justice of the Muscogee (Creek) Nation Supreme Court
Represented By
George William Rice
G. William Rice, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MONTE DEER, Justice of the Muscogee (Creek) Nation Supreme Court
Defendant - Appellee
ANDREW ADAMS, III, Justice of the Muscogee (Creek) Nation Supreme Court
Represented By
George William Rice
G. William Rice, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GREGORY BIGLER, Judge of the District Court of the Muscogee (Creek) Nation
Represented By
George William Rice
G. William Rice, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
THLOPTHLOCCO TRIBAL TOWN, a federally-recognized Indian Tribe
Represented By
Micheal Salem
Salem Law Offices
contact info

GPO Sep 03 2014
[10203089] Remanded; Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, published; Judges Tymkovich (authoring), Holmes and Bacharach. Mandate to issue. [13-5006]

Docket last updated: 09/05/2015 1:11 AM MDT
Monday, January 14, 2013
[10035625] Notice of appearance submitted by Micheal Salem for Appellant Thlopthlocco Tribal Town for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/14/2013. Manner of Service: ECF/NDA. 13-5006 --[Edited 01/15/2013 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 1/15/13.] MS
Related: [-]
[10035321] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/14/2013 Docketing statement due 01/28/2013 for Thlopthlocco Tribal Town. Transcript order form due 01/28/2013 for Micheal Salem. Notice of appearance due on 01/28/2013 for Gregory Bigler, Monte Deer, Gregory R. Stidham, Kathleen Supernaw and Thlopthlocco Tribal Town. 13-5006
Related: [-]