Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Denise Page Hood
Case #: 2:17-mc-51635
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2017

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 13, 2023
17 17 order Reinstatement - Attorney Discipline Only Mon 02/13 10:49 AM
CORRECTED ORDER of Reinstatement Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman, District Judge George Caram Steeh, District Judge David M. Lawson. (DTof)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 02/13 8:43 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re16 Order of Reinstatement on Hussian Ali Saleh at 930 Mason Street Suite 204 Dearborn, MI 48124 (DTof)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 02/13 10:54 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re17 Order of Reinstatement on Hussian Ali Saleh at 930 Mason Street Suite 204 Dearborn, MI 48124 (DTof)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
16 16 order Reinstatement - Attorney Discipline Only Fri 02/10 12:01 PM
ORDER of Reinstatement of Hussain Ali Saleh to the Practice of Law before the Federal Courts in the Eastern District of Michigan - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman, Judge George Caram Steeh and Judge David M. Lawson (LBar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
15 15 notice Notice - Other Tue 02/07 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF SATISFYING CONDITION IMPOSED IN ORDER by Hussian Ali Saleh (DAll)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
14 14 misc Attorney Appearance Fri 01/13 10:03 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sarah C. Lindsey appearing on behalf of Michigan Attorney Grievance (Lindsey, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
13 13 6 pgs order Order Fri 12/16 11:03 AM
ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR REINSTATEMENT TO PRACTICE OF LAW BEFORE THE FEDERAL COURTS WITHIN THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF MICHIGAN - CORRECTED Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman, District Judge George Caram Steeh, District Judge David M. Lawson. (DTof) Modified on 12/16/2022 (DTof)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Correction Fri 12/16 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Correction re 11 Order. (DTof)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Fri 12/16 9:54 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 11 Order, on Hussian Ali Saleh at 930 Mason Street Suite 204 Dearborn, MI 48124 and via email to hussienasaleh@gmail.com. (DTof)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
10 10 misc Mail Returned Thu 12/01 10:26 AM
COPY of5 Order mailed to Hussian Ali Saleh and returned as undeliverable (DPer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
minutes Miscellaneous Hearing Wed 11/30 8:34 AM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Paul D. Borman, District Judge George Caram Steeh, District Judge David M. Lawson: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 11/29/2022 Re:2 Affidavit Supporting Reinstatement Disposition: Taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Leann Lizza) (DTof)
Related: [-]
minutes Miscellaneous Hearing Wed 11/30 8:38 AM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Paul D. Borman, District Judge George Caram Steeh, District Judge David M. Lawson: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 11/29/2022 Re:2 Affidavit Supporting Reinstatement Disposition: Taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Leann Lizza) (SPin)
Related: [-]
minutes Miscellaneous Hearing Wed 11/30 9:23 AM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Paul D. Borman, District Judge George Caram Steeh, District Judge David M. Lawson. Miscellaneous Hearing held on 11/29/2022 Re:2 Affidavit Supporting Reinstatement Disposition: Taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Leann Lizza) (BSau)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
9 9 notice Appear* Wed 11/02 10:00 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Attorney Reinstatement Hearing set for 11/29/2022 04:00 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman, District Judge George C. Steeh, District Judge David M. Lawson (DTof)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 11/02 10:02 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re9 Notice to Appear on Hussian Ali Saleh at 930 Mason Street Suite 204 Dearborn, MI 48124 (DTof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
8 8 respp Reply to Response to Petition/Request/Application Tue 09/27 4:26 PM
REPLY to Response Petition for Reinstatement filed by Michigan Attorney Grievance. (Anderson, Charise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit GA's Investigative Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit Reinstatement Hearing Transcript,
Att: 4 Exhibit Report of Tri-County HP #11,
Att: 5 Exhibit Order Denying Petition for Reinstatement,
Att: 6 Exhibit Review Hearing Transcript,
Att: 7 Exhibit Order of Eligibility,
Att: 8 Exhibit Order of Reinstatement,
Att: 9 Document Continuation Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion - Free Tue 09/20 3:42 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Motion - Free Tue 09/20 1:41 PM
Emergency MOTION Extension to File GA's Report by Michigan Attorney Grievance. (Anderson, Charise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation Notice of Appearance
service Certificate of Service Tue 09/20 3:44 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re7 Order on Motion - Free on Hussian Ali Saleh at 930 Mason Street Suite 204 Dearborn, MI 48124 (DTof)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
5 5 order Appointing Grievance Administrator and Referring Affidavit for Reinstatement Fri 08/26 4:40 PM
ORDER APPOINTING Grievance Administrator and Referring Affidavit for Reinstatement Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JOwe)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Appointing Three Judge Panel Fri 08/26 4:36 PM
ORDER APPOINTING THREE JUDGE PANEL. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JOwe)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Fri 08/26 4:42 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Appointing Grievance Administrator and Referring Affidavit for Reinstatement,4 Order Appointing Three Judge Panel on Hussian Ali Saleh by certified mail at P.O. Box 3775, Melvindale, MI, 48122-0775 (JOwe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
3 3 cmp Misc. Case - Notice of Attorney Discipline* Thu 08/25 5:02 PM
Notice of Suspension from the Michigan Attorney Discipline Board for Hussian Saleh dated 10/23/2018. (JOwe)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order Thu 08/25 4:15 PM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Denise Page Hood to District Judge Sean F. Cox pursuant to EDM LR 83.22. (JOwe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2017
1 1 order Suspension/Disbarment Wed 12/06 11:58 AM
ORDER of Suspension with certificate of mailing Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Gill, C)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Discipline Board Notice of Automatic Interim Suspension