JUMP v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Shipp |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-12835 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 06, 2018 5:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (PCPC)
|
Represented By
|
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
JOHNNA JUMP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Thu 03/28 11:52 AM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney THOMAS T. LOCKE terminated. Attorney SUZANNE I. TURPIN for PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (PCPC) added.. (TURPIN, SUZANNE) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/27 5:08 PM
NOTICE by JOHNNA JUMP Notice Regarding Case Management Order 9 (SIMON, ANTHONY) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Wed 12/13 2:36 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk is hereby directed to TERMINATE the Motion pending at Docket Entry No.11 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 12/12/2023. (jdg) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 12/05 11:04 AM
Set Deadlines as to (11 in 3:17-cv-11035-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-11041-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-11047-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-11055-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-11069-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-11071-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-11211-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-11212-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (10 in 3:17-cv-11475-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-12539-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-12549-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-12567-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (13 in 3:17-cv-12575-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (10 in 3:17-cv-12690-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (13 in 3:17-cv-12831-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (11 in 3:17-cv-12835-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-12874-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney . Motion set for 1/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh) |
||
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney Substitute Attorney
Mon 12/04 4:41 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , MOTION to Substitute Attorney by JOHNNA JUMP.(SIMON, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 23, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 02/23 12:54 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson, Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/23/2023. (lb, ) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
30+
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/12 11:08 AM
ORDER that each of the Pre-CMO Cases identified in Exhibit A are DISMISSED, without prejudice, as to Defendant PCPC only. In the event a dismissal is inadvertently entered in a case not subject to dismissal for the reasons stated above, this will constitute grounds for the effected plaintiff to reinstate his or her action against PCPC, and the statute of limitations in such a case would be tolled from the date of the entry of dismissal until the date of reinstatement. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/11/2018.(km) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/10 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by GENE M. WILLIAMS on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. (WILLIAMS, GENE) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/09 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/09 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. (TERSIGNI, JULIE) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/09 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 01/08 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/22 8:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS T. LOCKE on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (PCPC) (LOCKE, THOMAS) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 12/11 2:44 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (PCPC) Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 12/11 8:50 AM
Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (sab) |
||
mdl
MDL Direct File
Mon 12/11 2:43 PM
Member Case Direct File on 12/08/2017, for MDL 16-2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jem) |
||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/08 2:50 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (PCPC) ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8316683) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOHNNA JUMP.(ASKEW, BENJAMIN) |