MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. SUNDARSINGH
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark A Kearney |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-05489 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 06, 2018 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
JESULIN SUNDARSINGH
|
|
Plaintiff
MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
JESULIN SUNDARSINGH
3011 HALLOWELL CT
BENSALEM, PA 19020 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 68.80.205.163
Terminated: 02/02/2018
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
Tue 03/06 4:04 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/6/2018. 3/6/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/01 7:10 PM
NOTICE by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC of Settlement (RUSHIE, A.) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Fri 02/02 2:08 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(RUSHIE, A.) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of A. Jordan Rushie, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/02 1:43 PM
1 AMENDED Summons Issued as to JESULIN SUNDARSINGH. Forwarded To: ALFRED RUSHIE on 2/2/18 (jl, ) |
||
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 02/01 2:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 68.80.205.163, filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC,JURY DEMAND.(jl, ) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 01/30 10:04 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE, IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING THREE (3) PAGES, FILED ON OR BEFORE 2/2/2018, AS TO WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS THIS MATTER FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/29/2018. 1/30/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 12/11 3:04 PM
NOTICE by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC re5 Order on Motion for Leave to File, On Comcast Cable (RUSHIE, A.) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 12/08 4:53 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF MAY AMEND ITS COMPLAINT TO ADD DEFENDANTS NO LATER THAN 1/19/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/8/2017.12/8/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Copy of Copyright Form
Fri 12/08 1:18 PM
Copy of Form to Register of Copyrights. (tj, ) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 12/08 1:13 PM
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO RULE 26(F)CONFERENCE filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC,MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT.(tj, ) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)
Fri 12/08 1:11 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(tj, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/08 1:10 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 68.80.205.163 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 170199.), filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(tj, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheets | ||
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 12/08 1:10 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (tj, ) |