New Hampshire District Court
Judge:Joseph A Diclerico, Jr
Case #: 1:17-cv-00700
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2017
Terminated:Jun 03, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Jun 09, 2018 5:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Osram Sylvania, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas F. Casolaro
Mclane Middleton
contact info
Jennifer L. Parent
Mclane Middleton
contact info
Plaintiff
Hossein Aghamehdi
Represented By
Megan E. Douglass
Douglas Leonard & Garvey PC
contact info
Benjamin T. King
Douglas Leonard & Garvey PC
contact info

GPO Feb 25 2019
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 03, 2019
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 06/04 1:44 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ko)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2019
43 43 misc Stipulation Thu 05/30 4:39 PM
STIPULATION re: Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice by Osram Sylvania, Inc.(Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2019
notice Trial Notice Fri 05/24 11:00 AM
FILED IN WRONG CASE. RESCHEDULING TRIAL NOTICE: (As to trial date) Pretrial Statements due 10/3/2019. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 10/17/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 11/5/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. (ko) Modified on 5/24/2019 to add: filed in wrong case text(ko)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
notice Case Settlement Thu 05/02 1:05 PM
Megan E. Douglass advised case settled. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case with prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 6/3/2019. (ko)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
order Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines Tue 04/23 12:09 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 42 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 5/24/2019.(lml)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
42 42 motion Continue and Extend Deadlines Mon 04/22 4:07 PM
Joint Assented to MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines Deadlines for Motions for Summary Judgment and Completion of Discovery filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc..(Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Form 3 - Proposed New Deadlines
Friday, April 19, 2019
41 41 respm Reply to Objection to Motion Fri 04/19 12:52 PM
REPLY to Objection to Motion re38 MOTION to Strike37 Surreply to Reply, Exhibit 2 Declaration of Robert Jordan Only filed by Hossein Aghamehdi. Surreply due by 4/24/2019. (Douglass, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
40 40 respm Objection to Motion Wed 04/17 12:28 PM
OBJECTION to38 MOTION to Strike37 Surreply to Reply, Exhibit 2 Declaration of Robert Jordan Only filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 4/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
39 39 misc Addendum Fri 04/12 12:28 PM
Addendum/ to38 MOTION to Strike37 Surreply to Reply, Exhibit 2 Declaration of Robert Jordan Only by Hossein Aghamehdi. (Douglass, Megan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
38 38 motion Strike Thu 04/11 4:20 PM
MOTION to Strike37 Surreply to Reply, Exhibit 2 Declaration of Robert Jordan Only filed by Hossein Aghamehdi. Follow up on Objection on 4/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Douglass, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Answer #18
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
37 37 respm Surreply to Reply Wed 04/10 2:04 PM
SURREPLY to Reply to26 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc..(Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Deposition Excerpts,
Att: 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Robert A. Jordan
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
36 36 respm Reply to Objection to Motion Wed 04/03 5:48 PM
REPLY to Objection to Motion re26 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Hossein Aghamehdi. Surreply due by 4/8/2019.(Douglass, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Email from Def. Counsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Plaint. Depo. Excerpts,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Def. Interrog. Response
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Exceed Order on Sealed Motion Wed 04/03 2:33 PM
ORDER granting 31 Motion to Exceed Page Limit Under Rule 7.1(e)(2). Aghamehdi's reply memorandum shall not exceed twelve pages. OSRAM's response also shall not exceed twelve pages. Granting 33 Assented to Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits to the Declaration Attached to Its Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
34 34 respm Objection to Motion Tue 04/02 2:33 PM
OBJECTION to31 MOTION to Exceed Page Limit Under Rule 7.1(e)(2) (Partial Objection) filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 4/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2019
31 31 motion Exceed Fri 03/29 5:02 PM
MOTION to Exceed Page Limit Under Rule 7.1(e)(2) filed by Hossein Aghamehdi. Follow up on Objection on 4/12/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Douglass, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
30 30 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/20 3:16 PM
ORDER granting 27 Motion to Suspend Deposition Pending Ruling on Protective Order. The plaintiff's motion to suspend the deposition is granted, provided however, the parties may proceed with the deposition on topics unrelated to the matters that would be addressed by a protective order. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
33 33 motion Sealed Motion - Court Use Mon 04/01 11:42 AM
Assented to Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits to the Declaration Attached to It's Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order re32 SEALED EXHIBITS to 29 Objection to Motion 26 MOTION for Protective Order at Level I filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc..(ko)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Sealed Document Mon 04/01 11:36 AM
SEALED EXHIBITS to29 Objection to Motion26 MOTION for Protective Order at Level I filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc.(ko)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Orientation Handbook,
Att: 2 Wangli Business Emails,
Att: 3 Wangli Relationship Emails,
Att: 4 Emails to Personal Account,
Att: 5 Emails to Wife
29 29 respm Objection to Motion Tue 03/19 8:45 AM
OBJECTION to26 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 3/26/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Nicholas F. Casolaro,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration (Notice of Conventional Filing),
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration (Business Conduct Guidelines),
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration (Notice of Conventional Filing),
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration (Proprietary Rights Agreement),
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration (Notice of Conventional Filing),
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration (Notice of Conventional Filing),
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration (Notice of Conventional Filing),
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration (Notice of Conventional Filing)
28 28 respm Objection to Motion Tue 03/19 8:27 AM
OBJECTION to27 MOTION To Suspend Deposition Pending Ruling on Protective Order filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 3/26/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
27 27 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/11 5:18 PM
MOTION To Suspend Deposition Pending Ruling on Protective Order filed by Hossein Aghamehdi. Follow up on Objection on 3/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Douglass, Megan)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Protective Order Mon 03/11 12:03 PM
MOTION for Protective Order filed by Hossein Aghamehdi. Follow up on Objection on 3/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Douglass, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, February 25, 2019
25 25 21 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 02/25 2:53 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 14, 2019
24 24 misc Brief/Memorandum Thu 02/14 12:29 PM
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM re23 Order,, Set Deadlines, Certification to New Hampshire Supreme Court by Hossein Aghamehdi(Douglass, Megan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
23 23 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 01/31 4:05 PM
ORDER: Counsel shall confer about certifying a question to the New Hampshire Supreme Court to determine whether the after-acquired evidence defense would apply in the circumstances of this case. A joint memorandum or separate memoranda shall be filed on or before February 15, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Memoranda due 2/15/2019. (ko)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
22 22 respm Surreply to Reply Tue 01/29 7:49 PM
SURREPLY to Reply to16 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Hossein Aghamehdi. (Douglass, Megan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 24, 2019
21 21 respm Reply to Objection to Motion Thu 01/24 12:17 PM
REPLY to Objection to Motion re16 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Related [+] filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc.. Surreply due by 1/29/2019. (Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-] filed to replace #20 to correct event
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
20 20 5 pgs respm Memorandum to Motion and/or Objection Wed 01/23 3:08 PM
MEMORANDUM re18 Objection to Motion, to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc.. (Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 01/23 1:28 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to Plaintiff's Objection and In Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/25/2019.(gla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 22, 2019
19 19 motion Leave to File Tue 01/22 5:03 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to Plaintiff's Objection and In Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc..(Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
Monday, January 14, 2019
18 18 respm Objection to Motion Mon 01/14 6:34 PM
OBJECTION to16 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Hossein Aghamehdi. Follow up on Reply on 1/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Douglass, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Objection,
Att: 2 Exhibit RPD 20,
Att: 3 Exhibit Offer Letter
Thursday, January 10, 2019
order Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond Thu 01/10 11:01 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re 16 Motion to Compel. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objection on 1/14/2019. (ko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
17 17 motion Extend Time to Object/Respond Wed 01/09 3:01 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to16 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses to 01/14/2019 filed by Hossein Aghamehdi.(King, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 26, 2018
16 16 motion Compel Wed 12/26 3:17 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 1/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - OSRAM Oct. 9, 2018 Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff Nov. 2, 2018 Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - OSRAM Nov. 28, 2018 Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff Dec. 3, 2018 Letter,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Excerpts of Disputed Discovery Requests
Monday, November 19, 2018
notice Trial Notice Mon 11/19 8:55 AM
TRIAL NOTICE: Summary Judgment Motions due by 5/1/2019. Pretrial Statements due 8/1/2019. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 8/15/2019. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/22/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. Jury Selection/Trial reset for two week period beginning 9/4/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. (ko)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
order Order on Motion to Continue Trial Mon 11/19 7:29 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines and Continue Trial. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 15, 2018
15 15 motion Continue and Extend Deadlines Thu 11/15 4:13 PM
Assented to MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines and Continue Trial filed by Hossein Aghamehdi.(King, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Form 3
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
14 14 misc Miscellaneous Filing Tue 11/13 4:28 PM
Joint Statement Regarding Mediation by Osram Sylvania, Inc.(Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 01, 2018
13 13 order Protective Order Thu 11/01 11:29 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 11/01 11:25 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 Assented to Motion for Protective Order. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
12 12 misc Status Report Wed 10/31 4:33 PM
STATUS REPORT by Hossein Aghamehdi : Parties' Joint Statement re Status of Discovery(King, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Protective Order Wed 10/31 3:38 PM
Assented to MOTION for Protective Order filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc..(Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Protective Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Clawback Agreement
order Order on Motion to Extend Time Wed 10/31 2:04 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion to Extend Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/19/2018. (gla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
10 10 motion Extend Time Tue 10/30 4:25 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc..(Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (Civil Form 3 - Attachment to Assented-to Motion to Extend Deadline Established in Court's Scheduling Order)
Wednesday, September 12, 2018
notice Trial Notice Wed 09/12 10:42 AM
RESCHEDULING TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 2/14/2019. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 2/28/2019. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 3/7/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. Jury Selection/Trial reset for two week period beginning 3/19/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. (ko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
notice Hearing Notice Wed 03/21 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Hearing. Discovery Status Conference set for 11/7/2018 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. At least 7 days prior to the date of the conference, the parties shall submit a joint statement regarding the status of discovery.(vln)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
notice Trial Notice Tue 03/20 5:10 PM
TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 1/29/2019. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 2/12/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. JERS Statement due 2/19/2019. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 3/5/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. (ko)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 19, 2018
order Order on Discovery Plan Tue 03/20 5:08 PM
ENDORSED ORDER approving 9 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5 days. Case Track: Standard. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order. Trial: The two week period beginning March 5, 2019. Should discovery disputes arise in this case, prior to filing a motion to compel the parties may request a conference. The party or counsel seeking discovery related relief should confer with adverse counsel, identify mutually available dates and then contact the Deputy Clerk to schedule a conference with the court. The court will inform the parties and counsel what written materials, if any, will be permitted in advance of the conference. To the extent the aforementioned informal process does not resolve the discovery dispute, the parties may thereafter seek to resolve the dispute through a customary motion to compel discovery. The clerk's office shall schedule a discovery status conference at least 60 days prior to the close of discovery. The parties shall submit a joint statement on the status of discovery at least 7 days prior to the date of the conference. In light of the foregoing, the pretrial conference scheduled for March 28, 2018 is cancelled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/2/2018. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 6/28/2018. Mediation Follow Up on 11/13/2018. (ko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
9 9 motion Discovery Plan Wed 03/14 2:54 PM
Proposed Discovery Plan (Joint) filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc.. (Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2018
notice Pretrial Conference Fri 02/16 11:19 AM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2018 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/21/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2018
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance Thu 02/08 6:39 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas F. Casolaro on behalf of Osram Sylvania, Inc. Attorney Nicholas F. Casolaro added to party Osram Sylvania, Inc.(pty:dft).(Casolaro, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 02/08 6:37 PM
Disclosure Statement by Osram Sylvania, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/08 6:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc..(Parent, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2018
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Mon 01/29 9:28 AM
Return of Service Executed as to Osram Sylvania, Inc. by Hossein Aghamehdi. Served/Mailed on 1/18/2018. Answer Follow Up on 2/8/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(King, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2018
4 4 service Summons - Waiver Issued Fri 01/12 4:02 PM
Summons issued electronically as to Osram Sylvania, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(mc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice ECF
3 3 service Summons-Waiver - Request for Issuance Fri 01/12 1:04 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Hossein Aghamehdi(King, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2017
2 2 service Summons - Waiver Issued Wed 12/13 8:50 AM
Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Osram Sylvania, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (lml)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice ECF.
notice Notice - ECF Wed 12/13 8:47 AM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (lml)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint - New Case Mon 12/11 2:58 PM
NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1596315 filed by Hossein Aghamehdi.(King, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Notice ECF Notice of Lawsuit,
Att: 3 Summons - Waiver Waiver of Service
utility Case Assigned Wed 12/13 8:46 AM
Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:17-cv-700-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml)
Related: [-]