Carson v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen Gren Scholer |
Referred: | Renee Harris Toliver |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03353 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 09, 2018 4:13 AM CDT |
Defendant
Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Bank of New York Mellon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Carson
1023 Summit Circle
Carrollton, TX 75006 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Tue 01/15 3:23 PM
JUDGMENT: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and this case is DISMISSED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/15/2019) (zkc) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Tue 01/15 3:21 PM
Order Accepting16 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Defendants'13 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and this case is DISMISSED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/15/2019) (zkc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 01/15 3:23 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 17, 18. Tue Jan 15 15:23:51 CST 2019 (crt) |
||
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Fri 12/21 2:53 PM
FINDINGS CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Motion re:13 Motion for Summary Judgment. It is recommended that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, Doc. 13, be GRANTED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/21/2018) (epm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 12/21 2:53 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16. Fri Dec 21 14:53:54 CST 2018 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 10/03 8:52 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. Wed Oct 3 08:52:46 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 10/03 9:28 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15. Wed Oct 3 09:28:42 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Wed 10/03 9:27 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to respond to Defendants' Motion13 for Summary Judgment no later than October 23, 2018, if he is opposed to the dismissal of this case. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's claims without further notice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/2/2018) (mcrd) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Findings and Recommendations ~Util - Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Full List)
Wed 10/03 8:29 AM
*** PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR ***(axm) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 08/31 11:43 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon (Fisher, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A-1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A-2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) B-1, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
trial
Designation of Experts
Thu 06/21 11:17 AM
Designation of Experts by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Fisher, Leslie) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 04/13 10:08 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Gannon Helstowski is terminated from the case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/13/2018) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 04/12 4:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff filed by John Carson (Helstowski, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/02 1:45 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 6/4/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2018. Discovery due by 8/3/2018. Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/17/2018. Status Report due by 8/24/2018. Motions due by 8/31/2018. This case will be set for trial by separate order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/2/2018) (axm) |
|
8 | 8
4
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/02 1:38 PM
STANDING ORDER ON NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/2/2018) (axm) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
qcref
Scholer
Tue 03/13 9:10 AM
CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cea) |
|
6 | 6
6
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/12 8:38 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings per Special Order 3-318. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/8/2018) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Status Report
Thu 03/08 9:38 AM
STATUS REPORT filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Fisher, Leslie) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Tue 02/06 8:16 AM
ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/5/2018) (sss) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Godbey
Tue 12/12 9:37 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/11 4:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Successor in Interest to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Corporation Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates. (Fisher, Leslie) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 12/11 4:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 134th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, case number DC 17-14335 filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Successor in Interest to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Corporation Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8856526) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Fisher, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) 8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) 9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) 10, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) 11, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) 12, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) 13, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) 14 |