Judicial Watch, Inc et al v. Dean C. Logan et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Manuel L Real |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-08948 |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 11, 2018 2:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
Dean C. Logan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alex Padilla
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
League of Women Voters of Los Angeles
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Mi Familia Vota Education Fund
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Rock the Vote
|
Represented By
|
Movant
California Common Cause
453 S. Spring St. Suite 401
Los Angeles, CA 90013 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Election Integrity Project
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Griffin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhue Guyant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judicial Watch, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wolfgang Kupka
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delores Mars
|
Represented By
|
1. | Judicial Watch files a lawsuit over Los Angeles County 'inactive voter' list (latimes.com) |
Submitted Fri 12/15/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
99 | 99
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 04/15 7:30 AM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,79 and Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,80 , CCA # 18-56102 and 18-56105 The judgment of this Court, entered March 20, 2019, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA ORDER98 These appeals are dismissed as moot and the district courts July 16, 2018 order denying appellants motions to intervene is vacated. VACATED](mat) |