Ross County Board of County Commissioners v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45040 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 12, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Ohio Southern, 2:17-cv-00704 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:44 PM EST |
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Ross County Board of County Commissioners
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:58 PM EDT |
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 70 pgs COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6078216), filed by Ross County Board of County Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Resolution, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Myrick Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 Lantz Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Plf List of Attorneys | ||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6082782) of Paul T. Farrell, Jr. by Plaintiff Ross County Board of County Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6083769) of R. Edison Hill by Plaintiff Ross County Board of County Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-6084858) of Archie C. Lamb, Jr., and Neil E. McWilliams, Jr. by Plaintiff Ross County Board of County Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
6 | 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $1000 paid, receipt number 0648-6084873) of James M. Papantonio, Peter J. Mougey, Page A. Poerschke, Laura S. Dunning and Jeffrey R. Gaddy by Plaintiff Ross County Board of County Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:17-cv-662, 2:17-cv-663, 2:17-cv-664, 2:17-cv-665, 2:17-cv-680, 2:17-cv-682 & 2:17-cv-696 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Judge George C. Smith on 8/18/2017. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $800 paid, receipt number 0648-6095587) of Russell W. Budd, Laura J. Baughman, J. Burton LeBlanc, IV, and S. Ann Saucer by Plaintiff Ross County Board of County Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
8 | 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-6095593) of Roland K. Tellis and Mark P. Pifko by Plaintiff Ross County Board of County Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6096967) of Amy Jo Quezon by Plaintiff Ross County Board of County Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
11 | 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6097193) of Michael J. Fuller, Jr. by Plaintiff Ross County Board of County Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Defendant McKesson Corporation. McKesson Corporation served on 8/14/2017, answer due 10/13/2017. (Peterson, James) Modified text to display correct event, as well as corrected dates on 8/30/2017 (kdp). [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
13 | 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation on 8/14/2017, answer due 10/13/2017. (Peterson, James) Modified to show corrected dates on 8/30/2017 (kdp). [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation answer due 10/13/2017; McKesson Corporation answer due 10/13/2017. (kdp) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent I Holzhall for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
15 | 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Alana Valle Tanoury for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Tanoury, Alana) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
16 | 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Cardinal Health, Inc. on 8/14/2017, answer due 10/13/2017. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
17 | 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6104559) of William D. Wilmoth by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
18 | 18 ORDER granting3 ,4 ,5 ,6 ,7 ,8 ,10 , and11 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul T. Farrell, Jr., R. Edison Hill, Archie C. Lamb, Jr., Neil E. McWilliams, Jr., James M. Papantonio, Peter J. Mougey, Page A. Poerschke, Laura S. Dunning, Jeffrey R. Gaddy, Russell W. Budd, Laura J. Baughman, J. Burton LeBlanc, IV, S. Ann Saucer, Roland K. Tellis, Mark P. Pifko, Amy Jo Quezon, and Michael J. Fuller, Jr. In addition, Paul T. Ferrell, Jr.'s request for Designation as Lead Trial Attorney is GRANTED IN PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/31/2017. (agm) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
20 | 20 ORDER granting (32) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William D. Wilmoth in case 2:17-cv-00662-EAS-EPD; granting (29) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William D. Wilmoth in case 2:17-cv-00663-EAS-EPD; granting (30) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William D. Wilmothin case 2:17-cv-00664-EAS-EPD; granting (32) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William D. Wilmoth in case 2:17-cv-00665-EAS-EPD; granting (25) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William D. Wilmoth in case 2:17-cv-00680-EAS-EPD; granting (25) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William D. Wilmoth in case 2:17-cv-00682-EAS-EPD; granting (23) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William D. Wilmoth in case 2:17-cv-00696-EAS-EPD; granting (17) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William D. Wilmoth in case 2:17-cv-00704-EAS-EPD; granting (21) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William D. Wilmoth in case 2:17-cv-00713-EAS-EPD; granting (16) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William D. Wilmoth in case 2:17-cv-00723-EAS-EPD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/1/2017. (agm) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Rhinehart for Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
22 | 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Jeffrey Ireland for Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Ireland, Donald) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
23 | 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Clayton Hollon for Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Hollon, Christopher) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
24 | 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6122457) of Alvin L. Emch by Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
25 | 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6122480) of Robert A. Nicholas by Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
26 | 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6122495) of Shannon E. McClure by Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
27 | 27 NOTICE of Hearing: In Person Status Conference set for 9/25/2017 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (mas) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
28 | 28 NOTICE of Appearance by James B Hadden for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (Hadden, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
29 | 29 NOTATION ORDER Granting25 26 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert A. Nicholas and Shannon E. McClure, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. B Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/15/2017. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
30 | 30 ORDER Denying24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alvin L. Emch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/15/2017. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
31 | 31 NOTICE of Hearing: In Person Status Conference RESCHEDULED for 9/26/2017 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. The status conference previously scheduled for 9/25/2017 is VACATED . (agm) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
32 | 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F Murray for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
33 | 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian K Murphy for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (Murphy, Brian) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
34 | 34 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6122457) of Alvin L. Emch by Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
35 | 35 NOTATION ORDER Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alvin L. Emch by Defendant AmerisourceBergen, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Preston Deavers on 9/20/2017. [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
36 | 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
37 | 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
38 | 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant McKesson Corporation re37 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Status Conference held on 9/26/2017. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (mas) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | ||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
39 | 39 Transcript of In-Person Status Conference Proceedings held on 9-26-17, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla J. Coulter, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 10/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2017. (Coulter, Darla) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
40 | 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6151146) of Matthew Benov by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
41 | 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6152568) of Emily Johnson Henn by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
42 | 42 NOTATION ORDER Granting Dft McKesson Corporation's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Benove, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/5/2017. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
43 | 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6153075) of Geoffrey E. Hobart by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
44 | 44 NOTATION ORDER Granting Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily Johnson Henn and Geoffrey E. Hobart by Dft McKesson Corporation, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/6/2017. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
45 | 45 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/31/2099. by Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
46 | 46 ORDER granting45 Motion for Extension of Time. A briefing schedule will be determined at the 10/24/17 Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/10/2017. (jlk) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
47 | 47 171 pgs AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ross County Board of County Commissioners. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
48 | 48 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 - Status Conference, September 26, 2017. The Court scheduled the next pretrial status conference for 10/24/17 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Preston Deavers on 10/03/2017. (dh1) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
49 | 49 PRESERVATION ORDER directed to the Drug Enforcement Administration. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/04/2017. (dh1) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
50 | 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6166634) of Russell D. Jessee by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
51 | 51 NOTATION ORDER Granting Dft McKesson Corporation's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Russell D. Jesse, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/18/2017. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
52 | 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6171629) of Anthony J. Majstero by Plaintiff Ross County Board of County Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
53 | 53 NOTATION ORDER Granting Plts' Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony J. Majestro, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/23/2017. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
54 | 54 Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference Proceedings held on October 24, 2017, before Judge Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Chief Magistrate Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Court Reporter/Transcriber Allison A. Kimmel, Telephone number 614.719.3225. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 11/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2018. (ak) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
55 | 55 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 - Status Conference, October 24, 2017. The Court scheduled the next status conference for 12/13/17 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/27/2017. (dh1) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
56 | 56 TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2804) IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION - A transfer order has been filed today in this litigation. Rule 2.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, states...An order to transfer or remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 shall be effective only upon its filing with the clerk of the transferee district court. You will receive a certified copy of this order from the transferee court along with notification of the newly assigned case number(s) in that district. With the advent of electronic filing, Rule 9.1 of the Panel Rules shall be satisfied upon transmittal of the portion of the file deemed necessary and requested by the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/5/2017. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
57 | 57 ORDER vacating the 12/13/2017 Status Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/08/2017. (dh1) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
Case transferred to District of Ohio Northern. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | ||
58 | 58 TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2804)- IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION: All matters noted from this order pertaining to the Southern District of Ohio are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 12/5/2017; certified by the Northern District of Ohio on 12/12/2017. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
59 | 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Noramco, Inc. on 12/2/2017, answer due 1/31/2018. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] |