Lawrence County Board of Commissioners v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45045 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 12, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Ohio Southern, 2:17-cv-00770 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:44 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith, LLC dba H.D. Smith, fka H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence County Board of Commissioners
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:37 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 71 pgs COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6105429), filed by Lawrence County Board of Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 Lawrence resolution, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 2 Myrick Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex 3 Lantz Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Plfs Counsel List | ||
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6109908) of Paul T. Farrell, Jr. by Plaintiff Lawrence County Board of Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
4 | 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6111658) of R. Edison Hill by Plaintiff Lawrence County Board of Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
5 | 5 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that 2:17-cv-768, 2:17-cv-769 and 2:17-cv-770 and case numbers 2:17-cv-662, 2:17-cv-663,2:17-cv-664,2:17-cv-665,2:17-cv-680,2:17-cv-682,2:17-cv-696,2:17-cv-704, 2:17-cv-713,2:17-cv-723 ARE related. Cases reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Judge Algenon L. Marbley, Judge Michael H. Watson and Judge George C. Smith on September 6, 2017. (jlk) Modified text to add a related case number on 9/7/2017 (kdp). [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 NOTATION ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/7/2017, Granting3 Plt's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul T. Farrell, Jr., conditional on Mr. Farrells registration for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and Mr. Farrell seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. (ECF No. 3.) Plaintiffs Motion for Designation as Lead Trial Attorney is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that Attorney Paul T. Farrell, Jr. may serve as trial attorney for the purposes of all pretrial proceedings. (Id.) Should the case proceed to trial, counsels status as trial attorney will be at the discretion of the District Judge. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
7 | 7 NOTATION ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/7/2017 Granting4 Plt's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of R. Edison Hill, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Cardinal Health, Inc. on 9/5/2017, answer due 11/6/2017. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent I Holzhall for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alana Valle Tanoury for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Tanoury, Alana) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
11 | 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6117699) of William D. Wilmoth by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6119313) of Amy Jo Quezon by Plaintiff Lawrence County Board of Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
13 | 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6119354) of Michael J. Fuller, Jr. by Plaintiff Lawrence County Board of Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
14 | 14 NOTATION ORDER Granting11 12 13 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William D. Wilmoth by Dft McKesson Corp; Amy Jo Quezon by Plt Lawrence County; and Michael J. Fuller, Jr. by Plt Lawrence County, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/13/2017. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
15 | 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-6120134) of Roland K. Tellis and Mark P. Pifko by Plaintiff Lawrence County Board of Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16 NOTATION ORDER Granting15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Roland K. Tellis and Mark P. Pifko by Plaintiff Lawrence County, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/14/2017. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
17 | 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation on 9/5/2017, answer due 11/6/2017. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
18 | 18 NOTICE of Hearing:In Person Status Conference set for 9/25/2017 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (mas) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to McKesson Corporation on 9/5/2017, answer due 11/6/2017. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
20 | 20 NOTICE of Appearance by James B Hadden for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (Hadden, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
21 | 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Rhinehart for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
22 | 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Jeffrey Ireland for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Ireland, Donald) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
23 | 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Clayton Hollon for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Hollon, Christopher) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
24 | 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $800 paid, receipt number 0648-6124665) of Russell W. Budd, Laura J. Baughman, J. Burton LeBlanc, IV, and S. Ann Saucer by Plaintiff Lawrence County Board of Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
25 | 25 NOTICE of Hearing: In Person Status Conference RESCHEDULED for 9/26/2017 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. The status conference previously scheduled for 9/25/2017 is VACATED . (agm) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
26 | 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6125610) of Alvin L. Emch by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
27 | 27 NOTATION ORDER Granting24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Russell W. Budd, Laura J. Baughman, J. Burton LeBlanc, IV, and S. Ann Saucer by Plaintiff Lawrence County, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/18/2017. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
28 | 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6125620) of Robert A. Nicholas by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
29 | 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6125638) of Shannon E. McClure by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
30 | 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F Murray for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
31 | 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian K Murphy for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (Murphy, Brian) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
32 | 32 NOTATION ORDER Granting26 28 29 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alvin L. Emch, Robert A. Nicholas, and Shannon E. McClure by Defendant AmerisourceBergen, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/19/2017. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
33 | 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation.. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
34 | 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Status Conference held on 9/26/2017. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (mas) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | ||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
35 | 35 Transcript of In-Person Status Conference Proceedings held on 9-26-17, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla J. Coulter, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 10/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2017. (Coulter, Darla) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
36 | 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $1000 paid, receipt number 0648-6148900) of James M. Papantonio, Peter J. Mougey, Page A. Poerschke, Laura S. Dunning and Jeffrey R. Gaddy by Plaintiff Lawrence County Board of Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
37 | 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-6148910) of Archie C. Lamb, Jr., and Neil E. McWilliams, Jr. by Plaintiff Lawrence County Board of Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
38 | 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6151205) of Matthew Benov by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
39 | 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6152660) of Emily Johnson Henn by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
40 | 40 NOTATION ORDER Granting36 37 Plt's Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James M. Papantonio, Peter J. Mougey, Page A. Poerschke, Laura S. Dunning, Jeffrey R. Gaddy, Archie C. Lamb, Jr., and Neil E. McWilliams, Jr., conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/5/2017. (Modified text on 10/5/2017.) (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
41 | 41 NOTATION ORDER Granting Dft McKesson Corporation's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Benove, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/5/2017. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
42 | 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6153107) of Geoffrey E. Hobart by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
43 | 43 NOTATION ORDER Granting Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily Johnson Henn and Geoffrey E. Hobart by Dft McKesson Corporation, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/6/2017. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
44 | 44 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/31/2099. by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
45 | 45 ORDER granting44 Motion for Extension of Time. A briefing schedule will be determined at the 10/24/17 Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/10/2017. (jlk) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
46 | 46 171 pgs AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lawrence County Board of Commissioners. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
47 | 47 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 - Status Conference, September 26, 2017. The Court scheduled the next pretrial status conference for 10/24/17 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Preston Deavers on 10/03/2017. (dh1) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
48 | 48 PRESERVATION ORDER directed to the Drug Enforcement Administration. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/04/2017. (dh1) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
49 | 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6166682) of Russell D. Jessee by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
50 | 50 NOTATION ORDER Granting Dft McKesson Corporation's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Russell D. Jesse, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/18/2017. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
51 | 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6171622) of Anthony J. Majstero by Plaintiff Lawrence County Board of Commissioners. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
52 | 52 NOTATION ORDER Granting Plts' Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony J. Majestro, conditional on registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order and seeking permanent admission to the bar of this Court as soon as practicable. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/23/2017. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
53 | 53 Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference Proceedings held on October 24, 2017, before Judge Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Court Reporter/Transcriber Allison A. Kimmel, Telephone number 614.719.3225. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 11/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2018. (ak) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
54 | 54 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 - Status Conference, October 24, 2017. The Court scheduled the next status conference for 12/13/17 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/27/2017. (dh1) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
55 | 55 TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2804) IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION - A transfer order has been filed today in this litigation. Rule 2.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, states...An order to transfer or remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 shall be effective only upon its filing with the clerk of the transferee district court. You will receive a certified copy of this order from the transferee court along with notification of the newly assigned case number(s) in that district. With the advent of electronic filing, Rule 9.1 of the Panel Rules shall be satisfied upon transmittal of the portion of the file deemed necessary and requested by the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/5/2017. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
56 | 56 ORDER vacating the 12/13/2017 Status Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/08/2017. (dh1) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
Case transferred to District of Ohio Northern. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | ||
57 | 57 TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2804)- IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION: All matters noted from this order pertaining to the Southern District of Ohio are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 12/5/2017; certified by the Northern District of Ohio on 12/12/2017. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
58 | 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Noramco, Inc. on 12/2/2017, answer due 1/31/2018. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.] |