Campbell County Fiscal Court v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45022 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 2:17-cv-00167 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:45 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Meijer, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Campbell County Fiscal Court
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:14 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
Conflict Check run. (ECO) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
1 | 1 69 pgs COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-3896394), filed by Campbell County Fiscal Court.(ECO) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Tina Lantz, | ||
Att: 4 Summons to Amerisourcebergen, | ||
Att: 5 Summons to Cardinal Hill, | ||
Att: 6 Summons McKesson | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
4 | 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER:1) Case referred to United States Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Case will revert back to the undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 TRANSFER ORDER: That this action is REASSIGNED to the Honorable United States District Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 9/22/2017.(ECO)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 COPY of Motion to Transfer filed with JPML re Transfer of Case for inclusion in National Prescription Opiate Litigation from James Peterson (TJZ) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Motion to Transfer Cases | ||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8 171 pgs AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Campbell County Fiscal Court.(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
Clerk's Note: re8 Amended Complaint. The Clerk notes an Amended Complaint was filed; however, no summons were provided to the Clerk for issuance. If you desire summons to be issued, the forms are available on the Courts website, www.kyed.uscourts.gov. A summons may be issued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance on paper or by electronically filing a Notice of Filing with the prepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days .(TJZ) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to R. Edison Hill, Peter J. Mougey re9 MOTION for R. EDISON HILL to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Campbell County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3908583),10 MOTION for PETER J. MOUGEY to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Campbell County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3908600). (LST) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: re9 MOTION for R. EDISON HILL to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Campbell County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3908583),10 MOTION for PETER J. MOUGEY to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Campbell County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3908600) (LST) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
9 | 9 MOTION for R. EDISON HILL to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Campbell County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3908583)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order R. EDISON HILL, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF R. EDISON HILL, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA | ||
10 | 10 MOTION for PETER J. MOUGEY to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Campbell County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3908600)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order PETER J. MOUGEY, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF PETER J. MOUGEY, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - SUPREME COURT OF AL, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - SUPREME COURT OF FL | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION for J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Campbell County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3909139)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - LOUISIANA STATE BAR, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - SUPREME COURT OF TEXAS | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K. Phillips on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed re11 MOTION for J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Campbell County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3909139). (TJZ) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re11 MOTION for J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Campbell County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3909139) (TJZ) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
15 | 15 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: re15 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (TJZ) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Margaret Brannon.15 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation has been filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (TJZ) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
17 | 17 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Steven B. Loy.15 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation has been filed by Cardinal Health without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (TJZ) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
18 | 18 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
19 | 19 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
20 | 20 ORDER: 1) Plaintiffs Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice [9, 10, 11] areGRANTED; 2) R. Edison Hill is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs;3) Peter J. Mougey is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs; 4) J. Burton LeBlanc, IV is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/3/2017. (TJZ)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
21 | 21 ORDER: 1) The parties Agreed Motion to Stay15 is GRANTED; 2) This action shall be STAYED pending a determination of the Judicial Panel onMultidistrict Litigation; 3) Plaintiffs counsel will continue to effectuate service of the Complaint and/or any Amended Complaint in this action;4) Defendants will make a formal notice of appearance and necessary courtadministrative filings in a timely manner after service; 5) The parties SHALL FILE a status report no later than 180 days from the date of entry of this order explaining any relevant developments. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/3/2017.(TJZ)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
22 | 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Campbell County Fiscal Court. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
23 | 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Campbell County Fiscal Court. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
24 | 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Campbell County Fiscal Court. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Brian Loy on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
26 | 26 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 (KRB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
27 | 27 CERTIFIED ORDER received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 2804. Signed by Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 12/12/2017. (TJZ)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
28 | 28 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 2:17-cv-00167. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received. |