Knox County Fiscal Court v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45028 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 6:17-cv-00248 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:46 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Forest Laboratories, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith LLC
|
|
Defendant
J.M. Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Knox County Fiscal Court
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:04 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
Conflict Check run. (RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
1 | 1 68 pgs COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-3890103), filed by The Fiscal Court of Knox County.(RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Tina Lantz, | ||
Att: 4 Summons (proposed) Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, | ||
Att: 5 Summons (proposed) Cardinal Health, Inc., | ||
Att: 6 Summons (proposed) Cardinal Health, Inc. | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KJA) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to J. Burton LeBlanc re6 MOTION for J. Burton LeBlanc, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Knox County Fiscal Court (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894669). (RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re6 MOTION for J. Burton LeBlanc, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Knox County Fiscal Court (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894669) (RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
4 | 4 ORDER: this action is REASSIGNED to the Honorable United States District Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for all further proceedings. Case reassigned to Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for all further proceedings. Judge Danny C. Reeves no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/18/2017.(RBB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
6 | 6 MOTION for J. Burton LeBlanc, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Knox County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894669)(Farrell, Paul) Modified on 9/19/2017 (RBB). [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of J. Burton LeBlanc, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 Certificate of Good Standing LA, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Good Standing TX | ||
7 | 7 MOTION for R. Edison Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Knox County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894958)(Farrell, Paul) Modified on 9/19/2017 (RBB). [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of R. Edison Hill, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 Certificate of Good Standing WV | ||
8 | 8 MOTION for Peter J. Mougey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Knox County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894960)(Farrell, Paul) Modified on 9/19/2017 (RBB). [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Peter J. Mougey, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 Certificate of Good Standing AL, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Good Standing FL | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to R. Edison Hill, Peter J. Mougey re8 MOTION for Peter J. Mougey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Knox County Fiscal Court (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894960),7 MOTION for R. Edison Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Knox County Fiscal Court (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894958). (RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re8 MOTION for Peter J. Mougey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Knox County Fiscal Court (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894960),7 MOTION for R. Edison Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Knox County Fiscal Court (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894958) (RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 ORDER: 1. The Plaintiff's Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R.6 ,7 ,8 ] are GRANTED; and 2. J. Burton LeBlanc, IV, R. Edison Hill, and Peter J. Mougey are admitted pro hac vice as counselors for the Plaintiff in the above-styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 9/19/17. (SYD)cc: COR; phv attorneys via US mail with GO re: Mandatory ECF and ECF registration [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10 Courtesy Copy of letter to JPML on motion to transfer from James C. Peterson of Hill, Peterson, Carper, Bee & Deitzler, PLLC (MRS) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Motion to Transfer to the JPML | ||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
Clerk's Note: re11 Amended Complaint. The Clerk notes an Amended Complaint was filed; however, no summons were provided to the Clerk for issuance. If you desire summons to be issued, the forms are available on the Court's website, www.kyed.uscourts.gov. A summons may be issued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance on paper or by electronically filing a Notice of Filing with the prepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days . (RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
11 | 11 170 pgs AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Knox County Fiscal Court.(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K. Phillips on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
Attorney Update. Attorney Gregory E. Mayes, Jr for McKesson Corporation added. (RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
15 | 15 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation staying responsive pleadings deadlines by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Knox Fiscal Court, McKesson & Cardinal. (Brannon, Margaret) Modified mtn text on 10/23/2017 (RBB). [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
Attorney Update. Attorney Robert Franklin Duncan for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation added. (RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
Attorney Update. Attorney Steven Brian Loy for Cardinal Health, Inc. added. (RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re15 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation staying responsive pleadings deadlines by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Knox Fiscal Court, Cardinal & McKesson (RBB) Modified on 10/24/2017 (RBB). [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Margaret Jane Brannon.15 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation staying responsive pleadings deadlines by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Knox Fiscal Court, Cardinal & McKesson has been filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
17 | 17 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Steven Brian Loy.15 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation staying responsive pleadings deadlines by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Knox Fiscal Court, Cardinal & McKesson has been filed by Cardinal Health, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
18 | 18 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
Attorney Update. Attorney Perry M. Bentley,Monica Hobson Braun for Cardinal Health, Inc. added. (RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
19 | 19 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
20 | 20 ORDER: 1. The parties' Agreed Motion to Stay [R.15 ] is GRANTED; 2. This action shall be STAYED pending a determination of the Judicial Panel onMultidistrict Litigation; 3. Plaintiff's counsel will continue to effectuate service of the Complaint and/or any Amended Complaint in this action; 4. Defendants will make a formal notice of appearance and necessary court administrative filings in a timely manner after service; and 5. The parties SHALL FILE a status report no later than one-hundred and eighty (180) days from the date of entry of this order explaining any relevant developments. (Status Report due by 2/3/2018.) STAYING CASE(11/3/2017) Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 11/3/2017.(RBB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
21 | 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Knox County Fiscal Court. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
22 | 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Knox County Fiscal Court. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
23 | 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Knox County Fiscal Court. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Brian Loy on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 (RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
26 | 26 CERTIFIED ORDER received from MDL Panel re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel. Case TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Ohio pursuant to TRANSFER ORDER filed in MDL Case Number 2804.(MRS)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
27 | 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 6:17-cv-00248. Electronic file and copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |