Garrard County Fiscal Court v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45023 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 5:17-cv-00369 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:47 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Garrard County Fiscal Court
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
Conflict Check run. (AWD) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
1 | 1 68 pgs COMPLAINT filed by The Fiscal Court of Garrard County. (Filing Fee $400; Receipt No. 0643-3890043) (AWD) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Declaration of Tina Lantz, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summons for Amerisourcebergen, | ||
Att: 5 Summons for Cardinal Health, | ||
Att: 6 Summons for McKesson | ||
3 | 3 Summons issued as to Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc. and McKesson Corporation. Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (AWD) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 MOTION for J. Burton LeBlanc, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrard County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894335)(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 Certificate of Good Standing LA, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Good Standing TX | ||
5 | 5 MOTION for R. Edison Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrard County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894340)(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 Certificate of Good Standing WV | ||
6 | 6 MOTION for Peter J. Mougey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrard County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894354)(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 Certificate of Good Standing AL, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Good Standing FL | ||
7 | 7 TRANSFER ORDER: action REASSIGNED to Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 9/18/17.(KJR)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to J. Burton LeBlanc, IV re4 MOTION for J. Burton LeBlanc, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrard County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894335). (KM) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to R. Edison Hill re5 MOTION for R. Edison Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrard County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894340).(KM) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Peter J. Mougey re6 MOTION for Peter J. Mougey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrard County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894354). (KM) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re4 MOTION for J. Burton LeBlanc, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrard County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894335),5 MOTION for R. Edison Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrard County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894340),6 MOTION for Peter J. Mougey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrard County Fiscal Court ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3894354) (KM) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
9 | 9 ORDER: 1. The Plaintiff's Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice4 ,5 ,6 are GRANTED; 2. J. Burton LeBlanc, IV, R. Edison Hill, and Peter J. Mougey are admitted pro hac vice as counselors for the Plaintiff in the above-styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 9/19/2017.(KM)cc: COR w/ copy of Mandatory ECF General Order & ECF Registration form to J. Burton LeBlanc, IV, R. Edison Hill & Peter J. Mougey [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10 COPY of Motion to Transfer filed with JPML re Transfer of Case for inclusion in National Prescription Opiate Litigation from James Peterson. (KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Motion for Transfer | ||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11 170 pgs AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Garrard County Fiscal Court.(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
Clerk's Note: The Clerk notes an11 Amended Complaint was filed; however, no summons were provided to the Clerk for issuance. If you desire summons to be issued, the forms are available on the Court's website, www.kyed.uscourts.gov. A summons may be issued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance on paper or by electronically filing a Notice of Filing with the prepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days (KM) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K. Phillips on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
Attorney Update. Attorney Gregory E. Mayes, Jr for McKesson Corporation added. (RBB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
15 | 15 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Garrard County Fiscal Court . (Brannon, Margaret) Modified filers on 10/23/2017 (KM). [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
***File SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re15 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (KM) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Margaret Brannon.14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KM) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
17 | 17 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Steven Loy.15 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation has been filed by Cardinal Health, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KM) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
18 | 18 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
19 | 19 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
20 | 20 ORDER: 1. The parties'15 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation to Stay is GRANTED; 2. This action shall be STAYED pending a determination of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; 3. Plaintiff's counsel will continue to effectuate service of the Complaint and/or any Amended Complaint in this action; 4. Defendants will make a formal notice of appearance and necessary court administrative filings in a timely manner after service; and $. The parties SHALL FILE a status report NLT 180 days from the date of the entry of this order explaining any relevant developments. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/3/2017.(KM)cc: COR, Attorney Michael Fuller. Modified text on 11/3/2017 (KM). [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
21 | 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Garrard County Fiscal Court. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
22 | 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Garrard County Fiscal Court. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
23 | 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Garrard County Fiscal Court. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Brian Loy on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
26 | 26 CERTIFIED ORDER received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to Transfer Order filed in MDL Case Number 2804. (KM)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
27 | 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 5:17-cv-00369. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received. |