Birmingham, City of v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45008 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:17-cv-01360 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:47 PM EST |
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Specialty, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Stuart D. Baker
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen, Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
John N. Kapoor
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharms, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Birmingham, City of
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:39 PM EDT |
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2909953. related document1 COMPLAINT against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corporation, filed by Birmingham, City of.(KAM, ). (Mougey, Peter) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corporation, filed by Birmingham, City of.(KAM, ) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE by Birmingham, City of re1 Complaint(Mougey, Peter) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Tina Lantz | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul T. Farrell, Jr. Motion is RIPE 8/17/2017 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by Birmingham, City of. (Mougey, Peter) PHV FEE PAID 1126-2912656 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ORDER granting conditionally3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion is granted, conditioned upon payment of the applicable $50.00 PHV fee. Such fee shall be paid by 8/23/2017 or this grant of leave will be rescinded. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 8/18/2017. (SJB) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
5 | 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James C. Peterson Motion is RIPE 8/18/2017 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by Birmingham, City of. (Mougey, Peter) PHV FEE PAID 1126-2913617 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
6 | 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice R. Edison Hill Motion is RIPE 8/18/2017 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by Birmingham, City of. (Mougey, Peter) PHV FEE PAID 1126-2913662 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-2916649. (Mougey, Peter) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | ||
7 | 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey Gaddy Motion is RIPE 8/23/2017 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by Birmingham, City of. (Mougey, Peter) PHV FE PAID 1126-2916482 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
8 | 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Neil E. "Ned" McWilliams, Jr. Motion is RIPE 8/23/2017 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by Birmingham, City of. (Mougey, Peter) PHV FEE PAID 1126-2916491 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
9 | 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James M. Papantonio Motion is RIPE 8/23/2017 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by Birmingham, City of. (Mougey, Peter) PHV FEE PAID 1126-2916491 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
10 | 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Russell W. Budd Motion is RIPE 8/23/2017 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by Birmingham, City of. (Mougey, Peter) PHV FEE PAID 1126-2916599 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). PHV FEE PAID 1126-2916635 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
11 | 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice J. Burton Leblanc, IV Motion is RIPE 8/23/2017 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by Birmingham, City of. (Mougey, Peter) PHV FEE PAID 1126-2916644 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
12 | 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Laura J. Baughman Motion is RIPE 8/23/2017 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by Birmingham, City of. (Mougey, Peter) PHV FEE PAID 1126-2916649 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
13 | 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice S. Ann Saucer Motion is RIPE 8/23/2017 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by Birmingham, City of. (Mougey, Peter) PHV FEE PAID 1126-2916672 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
14 | 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Roland K. Tellis Motion is RIPE 8/23/2017 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by Birmingham, City of. (Mougey, Peter) PHV FEE PAID 1126-2916675 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
15 | 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark P. Pifko Motion is RIPE 8/23/2017 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by Birmingham, City of. (Mougey, Peter) PHV FEE PAID 1126-2916678 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
16 | 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael J. Fuller, Jr. Motion is RIPE 8/23/2017 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by Birmingham, City of. (Mougey, Peter) PHV FEE PAID 1126-2916689 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
17 | 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amy Jo Quezon Motion is RIPE 8/23/2017 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by Birmingham, City of. (Mougey, Peter) PHV FEE PAID 1126-2916696 Modified on 10/11/2017 (KAM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
18 | 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter James Mougey on behalf of Birmingham, City of (Mougey, Peter) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
19 | 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Birmingham, City of. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 8/17/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Mougey, Peter) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
20 | 20 ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear PHVPHV; granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear PHVPHV; granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear PHVPHV; granting8 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV; granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear PHVPHV; granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear PHVPHV; granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear PHVPHV; granting12 Motion for Leave to Appear PHVPHV; granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear PHVPHV; granting14 Motion for Leave to Appear PHVPHV; granting15 Motion for Leave to Appear PHVPHV; granting16 Motion for Leave to Appear PHVPHV; granting17 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/14/2017. (KAM, ) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
21 | 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Birmingham, City of. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 8/17/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Mougey, Peter) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
22 | 22 NOTICE of Appearance by H Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, H) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
23 | 23 NOTICE of Appearance by J Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, J) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
24 | 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Birmingham, City of. Cardinal Health Inc waiver sent on 8/17/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Mougey, Peter) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
25 | 25 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Brown, Jr on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, David) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Saturday, October 14, 2017 | ||
26 | 26 Joint MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation.(Prater, Harlan) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - MDL Motion | ||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
27 | 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke G Malcom on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Malcom, Brooke) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
28 | 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson R Sharman, III on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Sharman, Jackson) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
29 | 29 NOTICE of Appearance by David G Hymer on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Hymer, David) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
30 | 30 TEXT ORDER granting26 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings and Continue Deadlines for Responding to the Complaint. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report by 12/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 10/18/2017. (SJB) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
31 | 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Birmingham, City of.(Mougey, Peter) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
32 | 32 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804; Record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Northern Ohio. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
33 | 33 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 2:17-cv-01360. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |