Wyoming County Commission v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45051 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Case in other court: | West Virginia Southern, 5:17-cv-02311 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:47 PM EST |
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
J M Smith Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wyoming County Commission
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/12/2019 4:35 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | ||
1 | 1 37 pgs COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-5503224. (btm) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1-22, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda, Inc., H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., J M Smith Corporation, McKesson Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (btm) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Summons as to Anda, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Summons as to H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., | ||
Att: 3 Summons as to J M Smith Corporation, | ||
Att: 4 Summons as to McKesson Corporation, | ||
Att: 5 Summons as to Miami-Luken, Inc., | ||
Att: 6 Summons as to Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., | ||
Att: 7 Summons as to The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C. | ||
3 | 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE re:2 Electronic Summons Issued on1 Complaint. Accepted by Secretary of State on 4/13/2017 as to McKesson Corporation ; answer due 5/4/2017. (slr) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Continuation, | ||
Att: 2 Continuation, | ||
Att: 3 Continuation, | ||
Att: 4 Continuation, | ||
Att: 5 Continuation, | ||
Att: 6 Continuation, | ||
Att: 7 Continuation | ||
5 | 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE re:2 Electronic Summons Issued on1 Complaint. Accepted by Secretary of State on 4/13/2017 as to Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. ; answer due 5/4/2017. (slr) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Continuation, | ||
Att: 2 Continuation, | ||
Att: 3 Continuation, | ||
Att: 4 Continuation, | ||
Att: 5 Continuation, | ||
Att: 6 Continuation, | ||
Att: 7 Continuation | ||
6 | 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE re:2 Electronic Summons Issued on1 Complaint. Accepted by Secretary of State on 4/13/2017 as to Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C. ; answer due 5/4/2017. (slr) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Continuation, | ||
Att: 2 Continuation, | ||
Att: 3 Continuation, | ||
Att: 4 Continuation, | ||
Att: 5 Continuation, | ||
Att: 6 Continuation, | ||
Att: 7 Continuation | ||
7 | 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE re:2 Electronic Summons Issued on1 Complaint. Accepted by Secretary of State on 4/13/2017 as to J M Smith Corporation ; answer due 5/4/2017. (slr) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Continuation, | ||
Att: 2 Continuation, | ||
Att: 3 Continuation, | ||
Att: 4 Continuation, | ||
Att: 5 Continuation, | ||
Att: 6 Continuation, | ||
Att: 7 Continuation | ||
8 | 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE re:2 Electronic Summons Issued on1 Complaint. Accepted by Secretary of State on 4/13/2017 as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation ; answer due 5/4/2017. (slr) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Continuation, | ||
Att: 2 Continuation, | ||
Att: 3 Continuation, | ||
Att: 4 Continuation, | ||
Att: 5 Continuation, | ||
Att: 6 Continuation, | ||
Att: 7 Continuation | ||
9 | 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE re:2 Electronic Summons Issued on1 Complaint. Accepted by Secretary of State on 4/13/2017 as to Anda, Inc. ; answer due 5/4/2017. (slr) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Continuation, | ||
Att: 2 Continuation, | ||
Att: 3 Continuation, | ||
Att: 4 Continuation, | ||
Att: 5 Continuation, | ||
Att: 6 Continuation, | ||
Att: 7 Continuation | ||
10 | 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE re:2 Electronic Summons Issued on1 Complaint. Accepted by Secretary of State on 4/13/2017 as to H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. ; answer due 5/4/2017. (slr) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Continuation, | ||
Att: 2 Continuation, | ||
Att: 3 Continuation, | ||
Att: 4 Continuation, | ||
Att: 5 Continuation, | ||
Att: 6 Continuation, | ||
Att: 7 Continuation | ||
11 | 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE re:2 Electronic Summons Issued on1 Complaint. Accepted by Secretary of State on 4/13/2017 as to Miami-Luken, Inc. ; answer due 5/4/2017. (slr) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Continuation, | ||
Att: 2 Continuation, | ||
Att: 3 Continuation, | ||
Att: 4 Continuation, | ||
Att: 5 Continuation, | ||
Att: 6 Continuation, | ||
Att: 7 Continuation | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12 JOINT MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, McKesson Corporation, The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., Wyoming County Commission To Extend Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 4/21/2017 to add party filer) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME for Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. to respond to1 Complaint to June 5, 2017 by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Wyoming County Commission (Arceneaux, Webster) (Modified on 4/26/2017 to add party filer) (ts). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
14 | 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. (Arceneaux, Webster) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re:15 ORDER: ERROR: Incorrect image attached; CORRECTON: Incorrect image removed and replaced with correct image (slr). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | ||
15 | 15 ORDER: Granting the12 JOINT MOTION of the Plaintiffs and Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, McKesson Corporation, and The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C. To Extend Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss; directing Plaintiffs to file any responses to Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants 28 days from the date of the filing of such a Motion to Dismiss; directing Defendants to file their replies 14 days from the date of Plaintiff's response; scheduling a Status Conference for 5/2/2017 at 11:00 AM in Charleston before Judge David A. Faber. Signed by Judge David A. Faber on 4/26/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr) (Main Document 15 replaced on 4/26/2017) (slr). Modified on 4/26/2017 to remove and replace incorrect image (slr). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc E. Williams, Alexander L. Turner on behalf of H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (Williams, Marc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
17 | 17 ANSWER TO1 Complaint With Jury Demand by H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (Williams, Marc) (Modified on 4/30/2017 to add jury demand)(ts). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
18 | 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (Williams, Marc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re:19 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Anda, Inc. ERROR: Incorrect image attached. CORRECTION: Incorrect image removed and replaced with correct image. (skh) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | ||
19 | 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Anda, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to Disclosure)(Jones, Keith) (Modified on 5/1/2017 to remove and replace incorrect image) (skh). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
20 | 20 STIPULATION Extending Time for Anda, Inc. to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to1 Complaint to 05/22/2017 by Anda, Inc., Wyoming County Commission (Jones, Keith) (Modified on 5/1/2017 to add party filer)(ts). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
21 | 21 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Russell D. Jessee Requesting Removal From the Court's Service List on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Jessee, Russell) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
22 | 22 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Russell D. Jessee for Devon J. Stewart Requesting Removal From the Court's Service List on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Stewart, Devon) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
23 | 23 MOTION by McKesson Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint. (Wakefield, Jeffrey) (Modified on 5/2/2017 to add link to # 1 complaint) (ts). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
24 | 24 21 pgs MEMORANDUM OF LAW by McKesson Corporation in support of23 MOTION by McKesson Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint (Wakefield, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
25 | 25 STATUS CONFERENCE held by Judge David A. Faber on 5/2/2017; Court Reporter: Lisa Cook. (cel) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
26 | 26 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Status Conference held on May 2, 2017, before Judge David A. Faber. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/15/2017. Redaction Request due 5/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2017. (lac) Modified on 5/3/2017 to replace image. (klc). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
27 | 27 ORDER upon Status Conference held 5/2/2017: Scheduling Oral Argument on the23 MOTION by McKesson Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint for 6/20/2017 10:00 AM in Charleston before Judge David A. Faber; staying various deadlines by which parties must (1) answer complaint; (2) move to dismiss complaint; and/or (3) respond/reply to pending motions to dismiss or dispositive motions. Signed by Judge David A. Faber on 5/4/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
28 | 28 MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Emch, A.) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
29 | 29 25 pgs MEMORANDUM by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation in support of28 MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint. (Emch, A.) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
30 | 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Emch, A.) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
31 | 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Wakefield, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
32 | 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laurie K. Miller, Thomas J. Hurney, Jr. on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc. (Miller, Laurie) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
33 | 33 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Miami-Luken, Inc. (Miller, Laurie) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
34 | 34 RESPONSE by Wyoming County Commission in opposition to23 MOTION by McKesson Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint and28 MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint. (msa) (Modified on 5/23/2017 to add party filer name and to add links to #23 and #28 motions)(skh). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
35 | 35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants McKesson Corporation and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation to file their reply to34 Response In Opposition to June 2, 2017 by McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Wyoming County Commission (Wakefield, Jeffrey) (Modified on 5/23/2017 to add party filers and to add link to # 34 response in opposition) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
36 | 36 UNOPPOSED MOTION by McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Reply to Motions to Dismiss (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Wakefield, Jeffrey) (Modified on 5/31/2017 to add party filer) (ts). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
37 | 37 ORDER granting Defendants'36 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages: The Court FINDS that permitting AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation; Cardinal Health 110, LLC; and McKesson Corporation to file a single, joint reply will promote judicial economy and ORDERS that the three defendants be permitted to file a joint reply not exceeding 50 pages in length. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 5/31/2017. (cc: counsel of record) (mk) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
38 | 38 REPLY by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, McKesson Corporation to34 Response In Opposition. (Schwendeman, Adam) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
39 | 39 MOTION HEARING held by Judge David A. Faber on 6/20/2017 re:28 MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint,23 MOTION by McKesson Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint; Court Reporter: Lisa Cook. (Attachment: #1 Attorneys List) (cel) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
40 | 40 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Motions Hearing held on June 20, 2017, before Judge David A. Faber. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/3/2017. Redaction Request due 7/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2017. (lac) (Main Document 40 replaced on 6/26/2017. CORRECTION: Revised appearances listed on pages 5 and 6.) (klc). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
41 | 41 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, McKesson Corporation re:23 MOTION by McKesson Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint,28 MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Emch, A.) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
42 | 42 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Meredith S. Auten on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. Local counsel: Adam J. Schwendeman. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-5897300. (Schwendeman, Adam) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
43 | 43 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Eric Sitarchuk on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. Local counsel: Adam J. Schwendeman. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-5897331. (Schwendeman, Adam) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
44 | 44 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND TERMINATION OF REPRESENTATION of Paul T. Farrell, Jr. on behalf of Wyoming County Commission (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
45 | 45 MOTION by H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. for Joinder in28 MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint,23 MOTION by McKesson Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint (Williams, Marc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
46 | 46 MOTION by H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. to Dismiss re:1 Complaint(Williams, Marc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
47 | 47 BRIEF by H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. in support of46 MOTION by H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. to Dismiss re:1 Complaint (Williams, Marc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
48 | 48 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, McKesson Corporation re:23 MOTION by McKesson Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint,28 MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation to Dismiss1 Complaint (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Emch, A.) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
49 | 49 AMENDED MOTION by H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. to Dismiss re:1 Complaint(Williams, Marc) (Modified on 9/26/2017 to remove link to #46 motion) (ts). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
50 | 50 MOTION by H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. for Partial Lift of Stay to Permit Briefing and Adjudication of Its Separate Motion to Dismiss (Williams, Marc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
51 | 51 NOTICE Regarding Potential Non-Party Fault Under W. Va. Code §55-7-13d by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. (Arceneaux, Webster) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
52 | 52 STIPULATION TO STAY IDENTIFICATION OF NONPARTIES AT FAULT by H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (Williams, Marc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
53 | 53 NOTICE Regarding Non-Party Fault Under W.Va. Code 55-7-13d(a)(2) by Anda, Inc., Wyoming County Commission (Jones, Keith) (Modified on 9/27/2017 to add party filer) (ts). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
54 | 54 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Anda, Inc., Wyoming County Commission For Phased Identification Of Non Parties At Fault re:53 NOTICE Regarding Non-Party Fault Under W.Va. Code 55-7-13d(a)(2) (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Keith) (Modified on 9/27/2017 to add party filer) (ts). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
55 | 55 UNOPPOSED MOTION AND STIPULATION by The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., Wyoming County Commission for Phased Identification of NonParties at Fault (Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 9/27/2017 to add party filer)(ts). [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
56 | 56 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Anda, Inc.'s ("Anda")54 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Phased Identification of Nonparties at Fault and ORDERS that: (1) The Court takes notice that Anda has filed an initial notice of nonparty fault pursuant to W. Va. Code § 55-7-13d that specifies the categories of nonparties to whom it seeks to allocate fault. (2) Anda shall later file a further notice that identifies by name and address, or other specific identification, the nonparties to whom it seeks to allocate fault. The time for these further notices will be set at the Rule 26(f) conference or thereafter. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 9/28/2017. (cc: all counsel of record and any unrepresented parties) (arb) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
57 | 57 ORDER granting Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.'s Unopposed55 MOTION and Stipulation for Phased Identification of Nonparties at Fault under the terms outlined in the unopposed motion. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 10/5/2017. (cc: attys) (mk) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
58 | 58 NOTICE Regarding Potential Non-Party Fault Under W. Va. Code § 55-7-13d by The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
59 | 59 NOTICE of Non-Party Fault Under W.Va. Code 55-7-13(d)(a)(2) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Emch, A.) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
60 | 60 NOTICE Regarding Potential Non-Party Fault Under WV Code 55-7-13d by McKesson Corporation (Wakefield, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
61 | 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc E. Williams, Alexander L. Turner, Christopher D. Smith on behalf of J M Smith Corporation. (Williams, Marc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
62 | 62 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant J M Smith Corporation (Williams, Marc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
63 | 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John D. Hoblitzell, III on behalf of J M Smith Corporation. (Hoblitzell, John) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
64 | 64 MOTION by Eric Sitarchuk to Withdraw Appearance on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Emch, A.) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
65 | 65 MOTION by Meredith S. Auten to Withdraw Appearance on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Emch, A.) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
66 | 66 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Miami-Luken, Inc., Wyoming County Commission and STIPULATION for Phased Identification of Nonparties at Fault (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Laurie) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
67 | 67 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Shannon E. McClure on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. Local counsel: Adam J. Schwendeman. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-6084031. (Schwendeman, Adam) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
68 | 68 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Robert A. Nicholas on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. Local counsel: Adam J. Schwendeman. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-6091420. (Schwendeman, Adam) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
69 | 69 NOTICE Regarding Potential Non-Party Fault Under W.Va. Code § 55-7-13d by Miami-Luken, Inc. (Miller, Laurie) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
70 | 70 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Transfer Order MDL 2804. (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
71 | 71 TRANSFER ORDER, JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/NDOH for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair for the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 12/05/2017. (cc: attys)(rmc) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/13/2017.] | |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
72 | 72 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 5:17-cv-02311. Electronic file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |