Arizona District Court
Judge:G Murray Snow
Case #: 2:17-cv-04612
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2017
Terminated:Aug 25, 2022
Case in other court:Ninth Circuit, 20-15407- Mandate 03/03/22 Ninth Circuit, 22-16465; Mandate 03/28/24
Last checked: Monday Jun 11, 2018 2:35 AM MST
Defendant
Ryan Hibbert
Represented By
Christopher Thomas Curran
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Sean Michael Carroll
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Darrell Eugene Davis
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
David I Weissman
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Defendant
RHG Ventures LLC
Represented By
Christopher Thomas Curran
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Sean Michael Carroll
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Darrell Eugene Davis
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
David I Weissman
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Defendant
Riot Hospitality Group LLC
Represented By
Christopher Thomas Curran
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Sean Michael Carroll
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Darrell Eugene Davis
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
David I Weissman
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Defendant
Eric Sanchez
Represented By
Christopher Thomas Curran
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Sean Michael Carroll
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Darrell Eugene Davis
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
David I Weissman
Clark Hill Plc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Alyssa Jones
Represented By
Philip Jeffrey Nathanson
Nathanson Law Firm
contact info
Ekaterina Sokolova
Nathanson Law Firm
contact info

GPO Aug 10 2020
ORDER: Plaintiff Alyssa Jones' 313 Motion to Stay this Court's March 4, 2020 Order Pending Interlocutory Appeal is DENIED. Plaintiff's 314 Motion to Supplement Corrected Declarations Submitted in Support of Motion to Stay is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 317 Motion to Extend Time to Videotape Doctor Greenman's Trial Testimony is DENIED. Defendants' 320 Cross-Motion to Exclude or Limit Dr. Greenman's Testimony is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants' 323 Motion for Contempt and/or Other Sanctions is taken under advisement. Defendants are GRANTED leave to subpoena Chelsea Meyers, Elle Foster, and Shea Watson to produce their recent communications regarding Plaintiff's claims at Defendants' expense. Plaintiff shall produce her cell phone to the previously agreed upon Specialist for imaging no later than August 17, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall pay the initial cost for the Specialist, but should additional documents be located in this search that are discoverable, Plaintiff shall promptly reimburse the entire cost of the Specialist to the Defendants. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/10/20. (GMP)
GPO Feb 08 2021
gned by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/8/21. (DXD)ORDER - Plaintiff Alyssa Jones, and witnesses Chelsea Myers and Shea Watson shall show cause within 7 days of the date of this Order showing why this court should not hold them in contempt for failing to produce the contents of their cell phones pursuant to Order (Doc. 367). Plaintiff's Counsel, Philip Nathanson, shall show cause within 7 days of the date of this Order showing why this court should not hold him in contempt for failing to produce the contents of Alyssa Jones', Chelsea Myers', and Shea Watson's cell phones pursuant to Order (Docs. 375, 398). Telephonic Show Cause Hearing set for 2/26/21 at 2:00 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Dispositive motions due by 4/27/2021. The Second Renewed Motion to Enforce the Court's Orders (Doc. 403) is deferred until the Order to Show Cause hearing. The Request for Leave to File Motion for Expedited Ruling on Defendants' Request to Enlarge Summary Judgment Deadline (Doc. 408) is DENIED as moot. Si
GPO Mar 02 2021
ORDER denying 403 Motion to Enforce and granting in part 379 Motion to Enforce. Defendant's Motion for Contempt and/or Other Sanctions (Doc. 323), Plaintiffs Motion to File Under Seal (Doc. 405) and Defendants' Request for Leave to File Response in Opposition (Doc. 407) are denied as moot. Plaintiff and Mr. Nathanson pay Defendants the fees and costs it incurred in pursing their compliance with the Court's orders as discussed herein. Forensic Neutral K.J. Kuchta shall turn over he data from the cell phones of Alyssa Jones, Shea Watson, and Chelsea Meyers within 7 days of the date of this Order. Defendants may file a motion seeking reimbursement of the costs of the expert, K.J. Kuchta, in accordance with the Courts prior Order (Doc. 308) within 21 days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/1/2. (DXD) *Modified text on 3/3/2021 (DXD).
GPO Aug 25 2022
ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Sanctions (Doc. 439) is GRANTED. Defendants' Motion for Sanctions (Doc. 469) is DENIED as moot. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 434) is DENIED as moot.Defendants' Request for Leave for Leave to Respond to Separate Motion Reurging "Motion to Disqualify K.J. Kuchta and Digital Acuity" (Doc. 476) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's Fourth and Final Amended Complaint (Doc. 99) is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 08/24/2022. (CLM)
GPO May 23 2023
**Amended by Order (Doc. 505)** ORDER denying 495 Motion to Quash. Plaintiff and Mr. Nathanson shall post a supersedeas bond in the form of a cashier's check made payable to the Clerk of United States District Court in the amount of $83,490.60 no later than 5:00 p.m. on 5/31/23. A stay of the judgment for the amount due will be in effect upon their posting of the bond with the Clerk of Court. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/23/23. (DXD) Modified on 5/23/2023 (DXD).
GPO May 23 2023
AMENDED ORDER denying 495 Motion to Quash. Plaintiff and Mr. Nathanson shall post a supersedeas bond in the form of a cashiers check made payable to the Clerk of United States District Court in the amount of $83,490.60. A stay of the judgment for the amount due will be in effect upon their posting of the bond with the Clerk of Court. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/23/23. (DXD)

Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM MST
Friday, April 26, 2024
misc Disbursement Mon 04/29 11:17 AM
Disbursement made in accordance with514 Order on Stipulation payable to CLARK HILL PLC - IOLTA AZ TRUST ACCOUNT in the amount of $75,222.91, check number 55919033. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (AMN)
Related: [-]
misc Disbursement Mon 04/29 11:18 AM
Disbursement made in accordance with514 Order on Stipulation payable to Alyssa Jones in the amount of $12,212.88, check number 55919050. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (AMN)
Related: [-]