Arizona District Court
Judge:Cindy K Jorgenson
Case #: 4:17-cv-00606
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2017
Terminated:Jan 08, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 12, 2018 2:16 AM MST
Defendant
Diablo Burger Incorporated
Represented By
Christopher James Meister
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Justin Blaine Caresia
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC
Represented By
Christopher James Meister
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Justin Blaine Caresia
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Defendant
Diablo Burger Tucson LLC
Represented By
Christopher James Meister
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Justin Blaine Caresia
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Kassie Killebrew
Represented By
Kevin R Harper
Harper Law PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
42 42 1 pgs order Clerks Judgment Tue 01/08 3:24 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (SIB)
Related: [-]
41 41 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 01/08 3:20 PM
ORDER granting40 Stipulation of Dismissal: It is ordered that this matter is dismissed with prejudice, each side to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/8/2019. (SIB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 12/19 12:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Diablo Burger Incorporated, Diablo Burger Tucson LLC, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC.(Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, December 06, 2018
39 39 1 pgs minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Terminate Hearings 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Mon 12/10 1:53 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman: Settlement Conference held on 12/6/2018. The parties have reached a resolution and will be filing the appropriate documents with the Court. APPEARANCES: Counsel Kevin R. Harper for Plaintiff(s). Counsel Christopher James Meister for Defendant(s). Conference time: 9:30 AM to 6:30 PM.(ABU)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
38 38 notice Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses Tue 12/04 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendants Diablo Burger Incorporated, Diablo Burger Tucson LLC, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC. (Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
37 37 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 11/27 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Kassie Killebrew. (Harper, Kevin)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses Tue 11/27 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendants Diablo Burger Incorporated, Diablo Burger Tucson LLC, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC. (Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 08, 2018
35 35 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 11/08 1:58 PM
ORDER that a settlement conference in this action will be held on Thursday, December 6, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. at the Evo A. DeConcini U.S. Courthouse at 405 W. Congress St., Tucson, Arizona before the Honorable Leslie A. Bowman. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 11/7/2018. (SIB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 10/17 2:46 PM
ORDER that the Parties' motion (Doc.33 ) is GRANTED. All deadlines contained in the Scheduling Order (Doc.31 ) shall be extended by sixty (60) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 10/17/2018. (SIB)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 12, 2018
33 33 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/12 3:30 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines re:31 Scheduling Order by Diablo Burger Incorporated, Diablo Burger Tucson LLC, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC.(Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, August 24, 2018
32 32 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 08/24 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Diablo Burger Incorporated, Diablo Burger Tucson LLC, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC. (Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 13, 2018
31 31 order Scheduling Order Mon 08/13 12:14 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties are granted until August 31, 2018, to move to join additional parties or to amend their pleadings. All discovery, including depositions of parties, witnesses, and experts, shall be completed by January 18, 2019. Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before February 22, 2019. Counsel shall file a brief Joint Settlement Status Report (containing no specific settlement terms or offers) on or before December 1, 2018. Counsel shall file a Joint Proposed Pretrial Order within thirty (30) days after resolution of the dispositive motions filed at the end of discovery. If no such motions are filed, a Joint Proposed Pretrial Order will be due on or before March 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 8/10/2018. (See attached Order for details) (KEP)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
30 30 minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 08/13 12:06 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Scheduling Conference held on 8/10/2018. The Parties are directed to contact the Honorable Leslie A. Bowmans chambers at (520) 205-4500 to schedule a settlement conference in this matter. A formal written order will follow. Related [+] Hearing held 11:25 AM to 11:32 AM.(KEP)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Thursday, August 02, 2018
29 29 misc Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP Thu 08/02 4:54 PM
Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Kassie Killebrew. (Harper, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
28 28 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/09 12:31 PM
ORDER, the Case Management Conference currently set for July 18, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., is VACATED and RESET. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Case Management Conference shall be set for 11:10 a.m. on Friday, August 10, 2018, before the Honorable Bruce G. Macdonald, Courtroom 3C, Evo A. DeConcini U.S. Courthouse, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, Arizona. Counsel shall file with the court, on or before August 3, 2018, a Joint Report reflecting the results of their meeting and outlining the discovery plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 7/6/2018. (KEP)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 02, 2018
27 27 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 07/02 4:39 PM
MOTION to Reset Rule 16 Case Management Conference re:26 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Unopposed) by Diablo Burger Incorporated, Diablo Burger Tucson LLC, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC.(Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 05, 2018
26 26 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/05 12:38 PM
ORDER a Case Management Conference is set for July 18, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., before the Honorable Bruce G. Macdonald, Courtroom 3C, Evo A. DeConcini U.S. Courthouse, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, Arizona. Counsel shall file with the court, on or before July 11, 2018, a Joint Report reflecting the results of their meeting and outlining the discovery plan. All parties are expected to comply with Rule 26, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and to minimize the expense of discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 6/4/2018. (See attached Order for details) (KEP)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 04, 2018
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 06/04 1:17 PM
ORDER granting22 Parties' Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline to Exchange Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses.. The discovery served on April 19, 2018 is deemed timely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 6/4/2018. (KEP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2018
24 24 notice Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery Thu 04/19 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Diablo Burger Incorporated, Diablo Burger Tucson LLC, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC. (Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery Thu 04/19 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Kassie Killebrew. (Harper, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
22 22 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/11 4:22 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to extend the deadline to exchange mandatory initial discovery responses by Diablo Burger Incorporated, Diablo Burger Tucson LLC, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC.(Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 26, 2018
21 21 notice Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) Mon 03/26 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Diablo Burger Incorporated, Diablo Burger Tucson LLC, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC Notice of Filing First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint .(Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Redline of First Amended Answer and Original Answer
20 20 9 pgs respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Mon 03/26 2:23 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint Defendants' First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Diablo Burger Incorporated, Diablo Burger Tucson LLC, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC. (Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
19 19 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/13 11:13 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diablo Burger Incorporated, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC. (Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/13 11:10 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diablo Burger Incorporated, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC. (Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/13 11:08 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diablo Burger Incorporated, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC. (Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 03/13 10:59 AM
Defendants' ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint by Diablo Burger Tucson, LLC, by Diablo Burger Incorporated, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC.(Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
15 15 notice Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) Tue 02/27 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Kassie Killebrew . (Harper, Kevin)
Related: [-]
14 14 10 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/27 4:32 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kassie Killebrew.(Harper, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
13 13 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation Tue 02/06 12:14 PM
ORDER this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Bruce G. Macdonald for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation in accordance with the provisions of 28 U. S. C. § 636(b)(1) and L.R.Civ.P. 72.1 and 72.2. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV 17-0606 TUC-CKJ (BGM). Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 2/5/2018. (MFR)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2018
12 12 order MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer Mon 01/29 12:49 PM
ORDER granting a one-time extension of time to respond to complaint by 30 days. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the 30-day extension. The parties should be aware that the filing of a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) will not postpone the time for compliance with the MIDP. General Order 17-08 provides that compliance may be deferred only for motions to dismiss based on lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, lack of personal jurisdiction, sovereign immunity, or absolute or qualified immunity of a public official. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/26/2018. (See Order for details) (DPS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/24 1:56 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Diablo Burger Incorporated, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC.(Meister, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
10 10 service Service Executed Wed 01/17 9:11 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kassie Killebrew: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Diablo Burger Incorporated on 1/08/2018. (REK)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Service Executed Wed 01/17 9:10 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kassie Killebrew: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC on 1/08/2018. (REK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
8 8 misc 25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Assignment of Case to DJ (After Consent) Thu 12/28 2:24 PM
Minute Order: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. Case reassigned by random draw to District Judge Cindy K Jorgenson. All further pleadings should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV17-606-TUC-CKJ. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc 25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge Thu 12/28 2:02 PM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2017
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 12/15 12:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Diablo Burger Incorporated, Good Oak Bar Tucson LLC.(DPS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Thursday, December 14, 2017
4 4 notice Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Fri 12/15 12:27 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DPS)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Fri 12/15 12:27 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14966025. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bruce G Macdonald. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-606-TUC-BGM. Magistrate Election form attached. (DPS)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Fri 12/15 12:24 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Kassie Killebrew. (Harper, Kevin) (DPS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/15 12:23 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14966025 filed by Kassie Killebrew. (Harper, Kevin) (DPS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet