TMF Trustee Limited v. M/T Megacore Philomena et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-09010 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Dec 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 13, 2018 1:51 AM PDT |
Claimant
Novell Investments, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
M/T Megacore Philomena
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Hurricane Navigation Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
TMF Trustee Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THE IFO BUNKER FUEL aboard the M/T MEGACORE PHILOMENA provided by MONJASA, LTD., in rem
|
|
Defendant
Hurricane Navigation Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M/T Megacore Philomena
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
E.N. Bisso & Son, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Riley-Sherman Shipping Agency, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Ocean Energy Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Novell Investments, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Monjasa LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Dan-Bunkering (Monaco) SAM
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Cooper/T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
BP Marine Limited
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Alan Nakazawa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TMF Trustee Limited
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Oxygen Maritime Management, Inc.
Terminated: 03/01/2018
|
|
Defendant
Marine Gas Oil ("MGO")
Terminated: 03/01/2018
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
CLAUDIA SMALL
Terminated: 06/08/2018
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
GREGORY S. FELDMAN
Terminated: 06/08/2018
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, November 23, 2020 | ||
589 | 589
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Wed 11/25 4:18 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,,585 filed by Hurricane Navigation Inc.. CCA # 20-56037 Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (hr) |
|
588 | 588
order
Dismissing Case
Mon 11/23 4:31 PM
ORDER ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case587 . IT IS ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all claims, causes of action, and parties, with each party bearing that party's own attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to close the file. (hr) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
587 | 587
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 11/16 3:36 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) filed by Plaintiff and Counter-defendant TMF Trustee Limited.(Wise, Erich) |