PacerMonitor
A Fitch Solutions Service
Features
Plans & Pricing
About
Home
Features
Pricing
Getting Started
About Us
Start Free Trial
Sign In
Admin Login
USA vs Kessler
Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #:
1:17-po-02990
Case Filed:
Nov 17, 2017
Terminated:
Dec 05, 2017
Docket
Parties
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:53 PM EDT
Friday, November 17, 2017
1
1
Citation Issued as to Shelbi B Kessler (1) count(s) 1. (CVB Auto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1
Original Ticket
2
2
Initial Appearance set for
12/04/2017
at 09:00 AM in FMVA before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (CVB Auto)
Related: [-]
Continue to Create Account