Original Case: 4:11-cv-00129

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:13-cv-01654
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2013
Terminated:Aug 29, 2014
Last checked: Saturday Sep 05, 2015 1:23 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Planned Parenthood of the Heartland
Represented By
Tiffany L. Amlot
DENTONS US LLP
contact info
Stanley J. Thompson
DAVIS & BROWN
contact info
Kristen C. Rodriguez
DENTONS US LLP
contact info
Jonathan C. Wilson
DAVIS & BROWN
contact info
Alan Scott Gilbert
DENTONS US LLP
contact info
Interested party
United States of America
Represented By
Richard L. Richards
U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Interested party
State of Iowa
Represented By
Charles Roderick Reynolds
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
United States of America and State of Iowa, ex rel Susan Thayer
Represented By
Michael J. Norton
ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM
contact info
J. Russell Hixson
HIXSON & BROWN
contact info
Catherine Glenn Foster
ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM
contact info
M. Casey Mattox
ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM
contact info

GPO Aug 29 2014
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Roger L. Wollman, Steven M. Colloton and Raymond W. Gruender
AUTHORING JUDGE:Roger L. Wollman (PUBLISHED) [4191128] [13-1654]

Docket last updated: 09/05/2015 1:23 AM CDT

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.