AFLAC v. HUBBARD
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Clay D Land |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00246 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Dec 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 13, 2018 4:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
ANIBAL ALCANTARA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARTIN CONROY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DEBBIE CORT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TROY HUBBARD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARCUS JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JULIO LEATY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GARARD MCCARTHY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 03 2018
ORDER granting 4 Motion to Compel Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/3/2018 (glg) |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 02/06 9:41 AM
MANDATE of USCA AFFIRMING the decision of the District Court as to24 Notice of Appeal filed by JULIO LEATY, ANIBAL ALCANTARA, MARCUS JOHNSON, MARTIN CONROY, GARARD MCCARTHY, DEBBIE CORT, TROY HUBBARD(tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
USCA Order/Opinion NOT MANDATE
Mon 01/07 12:48 PM
USCA Opinion as to24 Notice of Appeal filed by JULIO LEATY, ANIBAL ALCANTARA, MARCUS JOHNSON, MARTIN CONROY, GARARD MCCARTHY, DEBBIE CORT, TROY HUBBARD affirming the district court(tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
appeal
Electronic Availability of ROA
Fri 08/03 1:46 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re:24 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically (tlf) |
||
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
Transcript Information Form
Tue 05/29 6:34 PM
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by ANIBAL ALCANTARA, MARTIN CONROY, DEBBIE CORT, TROY HUBBARD, MARCUS JOHNSON, JULIO LEATY, GARARD MCCARTHY. re24 Notice of Appeal (JOFFE, DIMITRY) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 05/07 5:13 PM
USCA Case Number 18-111869-CC re24 Notice of Appeal filed by JULIO LEATY, ANIBAL ALCANTARA, MARCUS JOHNSON, MARTIN CONROY, GARARD MCCARTHY, DEBBIE CORT, TROY HUBBARD (tlf) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Wed 05/02 3:24 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:16 Order on Motion to Compel,17 Judgment,24 Notice of Appeal,23 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Judge Appealed: Land. Court Reporter: Betsy Peterson. Fee Paid: Paid. (glg) |
|
appeal
Appeal Instructions
Wed 05/02 3:24 PM
Appeal Instructions re24 Notice of Appeal. The Transcript Information Form and instructions are available on the District Court website under Forms & Guides. **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 5/21/2018 (glg) |
||
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 02/15 12:03 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to23 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, by ANIBAL ALCANTARA, MARTIN CONROY, DEBBIE CORT, TROY HUBBARD, MARCUS JOHNSON, JULIO LEATY, GARARD MCCARTHY. Filing fee $ 505, Receipt No.: 113G-2809277. (JOFFE, DIMITRY) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Thu 01/25 10:20 AM
ORDER denying20 Motion for Reconsideration re20 MOTION for Reconsideration re Notice of Deficiency, filed by JULIO LEATY, ANIBAL ALCANTARA, MARCUS JOHNSON, MARTIN CONROY, GARARD MCCARTHY, DEBBIE CORT, TROY HUBBARD Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/25/2018 (glg) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
8
pgs
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 01/22 3:32 PM
RESPONSE filed by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS re18 MOTION for Reconsideration re16 Order on Motion to Compel (SUTTLE, BROOKS) |
|
Saturday, January 20, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Transcript of Proceedings
Sat 01/20 12:38 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/28/2017, before Judge Clay D. Land. Court Reporter/Transcriber Betsy Peterson. Volume Number: I of I. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (Peterson, Betsy) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
6
pgs
motion
Reconsideration
Thu 01/11 11:29 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re Notice of Deficiency, by ANIBAL ALCANTARA, MARTIN CONROY, DEBBIE CORT, TROY HUBBARD, MARCUS JOHNSON, JULIO LEATY, GARARD MCCARTHY filed by DIMITRY JOFFE.(JOFFE, DIMITRY) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Thu 01/11 10:29 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, every pleading, written motion and other papers must be signed by a party personally. You must refile your signed document within 2 days from the date of this notice. Please REFILE. (glg) |
||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
6
pgs
motion
Reconsideration
Wed 01/10 5:26 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re Notice of Deficiency, by ANIBAL ALCANTARA, MARTIN CONROY, DEBBIE CORT, TROY HUBBARD, MARCUS JOHNSON, JULIO LEATY, GARARD MCCARTHY filed by DIMITRY JOFFE.(JOFFE, DIMITRY) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 01/10 11:08 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. PLEASE REFILE the Motion as a text-searchable document. (glg) |
||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
6
pgs
motion
Reconsideration
Mon 01/08 5:15 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re16 Order on Motion to Compel by ANIBAL ALCANTARA, MARTIN CONROY, DEBBIE CORT, TROY HUBBARD, MARCUS JOHNSON, JULIO LEATY, GARARD MCCARTHY filed by DIMITRY JOFFE.(JOFFE, DIMITRY) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Affidavit of Debbie Cort, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Affidavit of Frederick Baker, | ||
Att: 3 3 pgs Affidavit of Marcus Johnson, | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs Affidavit of Louis Varela, | ||
Att: 5 3 pgs Affidavit of Troy Hubbard | ||
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment
Thu 01/04 9:14 AM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered dismissing this case. (glg) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
16
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Wed 01/03 2:01 PM
ORDER granting 4 Motion to Compel Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/3/2018 (glg) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Attorney Admission Fee Met
Tue 01/02 11:55 AM
Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by DIMITRY JOFFE (nop) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing
Fri 12/29 12:57 PM
TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Motion Hearing held on 12/28/2017 re all pending motions. The Court adopts the state court TRO and will rule of the pending Motion to Compel by January 5, 2018. The TRO will expire no later than January 5, 2018. Court Reporter Betsy Peterson (706-317-3111). CRD - Elizabeth Long; Participating Attorneys: Lisa Cassilly, Brooks Suttle and Dimitry Joffe. (esl) |
||
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 12/28 8:45 AM
REPLY to Response filed by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS re 4 MOTION to Compel (CASSILLY, LISA) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
24
pgs
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 12/27 11:31 AM
RESPONSE filed by ANIBAL ALCANTARA, MARTIN CONROY, DEBBIE CORT, TROY HUBBARD, MARCUS JOHNSON, JULIO LEATY, GARARD MCCARTHY re 4 MOTION to Compel,10 MOTION for Hearing(JOFFE, DIMITRY) |
|
Att: 1 6 pgs Affidavit Declaration of Dimitry Joffe | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response to Motion 1-Restrict Document ONLY to Case Participants
Wed 12/27 10:38 AM
***RESTRICTED to Case Attorneys of Record and Court Users***, RESPONSE filed by ANIBAL ALCANTARA, MARTIN CONROY, DEBBIE CORT, TROY HUBBARD, MARCUS JOHNSON, JULIO LEATY, GARARD MCCARTHY re 4 MOTION to Compel,10 MOTION for Hearing(JOFFE, DIMITRY) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Dimitry Joffe | ||
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 12/26 4:40 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support filed by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS re: 4 MOTION to Compel (CASSILLY, LISA) |
|
10 | 10
3
pgs
motion
Hearing
Tue 12/26 4:36 PM
MOTION for Hearing by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS filed by LISA H CASSILLY.(CASSILLY, LISA) |
|
Att: 1 10 pgs Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 142 pgs Affidavit of Jeff Arrington, | ||
Att: 3 98 pgs Affidavit of Lisa Cassilly (Exhibit 1 Redacted) | ||
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 12/21 10:11 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS identifying Corporate Parent AFLAC INCORPORATED, Other Affiliate AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE CO. OF NEW YORK for AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS. (CASSILLY, LISA) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 12/20 3:56 PM
Notice of Deficiency; Pursuant to Local Rule 87, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement - Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately (tlf) |
||
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 12/19 5:46 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER The Court has temporarily granted Plaintiff's Motion to Seal . However, consistent with this Court's practice, the parties shall file, in addition to the restricted documents, copies of those documents with the information that is deemed to be privileged redacted. These redacted documents shall be filed on the public docket and shall not be restricted. These redacted copies shall be filed prior to the hearing on the pending motions. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on December 19, 2017. (CDL) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion to Seal Document
Tue 12/19 5:35 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER temporarily granting 3 Motion to Seal Document. The Court construes Plaintiff's motion as seeking to have the Court restrict access to all filings in this action such that only the parties to this action and Court personnel shall have access. The Court is not firmly convinced that access should be restricted as to all of these filings. However, the Court finds it appropriate to temporarily restrict access until it can further consider whether such restricted access should be allowed. Accordingly, the motion to restrict access is temporarily granted, and the Clerk is directed to restrict access as described above. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on December 19, 2017 (CDL) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 12/19 9:48 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Attorney Case Opening - Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization - The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES) - Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties - For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia - NO NEED TO REFILE. (glg) |
||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 12/19 10:02 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Attorney Case Opening - Parties were added with their name backwards, ie Johnson Marcus. The parties name is MARCUS JOHNSON - NO NEED TO REFILE. (glg) |
||
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Tue 12/19 5:50 PM
NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTION: Motion Hearing set for 12/28/2017 02:00 PM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. (esl) |
||
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order of Transfer/Local Rule 3.4 Statement
Mon 12/18 10:32 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued.CASE TRANSFERRED TO Columbus Division Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 Statement. (mdm) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 12/18 10:41 AM
US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND added. US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS no longer assigned to case., Case Reassigned to US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS no longer assigned to the case. (glg) |
||
NOTICE TO COUNSEL BROOKS SUTTLE - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (glg) Modified on 12/18/2017 (tlf). |