City of Hammond v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45082 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 18, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Indiana Northern, 2:17-cv-00431 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:51 PM EST |
Defendant
H.D. Smith, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DIK Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Hammond
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:55 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 168 pgs COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3411673.), filed by City of Hammond.(Shevitz, Richard) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn A Toops on behalf of City of Hammond (Toops, Lynn) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vess A Miller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Miller, Vess) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Irwin B Levin on behalf of City of Hammond (Levin, Irwin) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E Shevitz on behalf of City of Hammond (Shevitz, Richard) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff S Gibson on behalf of City of Hammond (Gibson, Jeff) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A Knoll on behalf of City of Hammond (Knoll, Jonathan) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
Judge Rudy Lozano and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (New Case) (sct) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | ||
8 | 8 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Hammond. Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 11/22/2017, answer due 12/13/2017; Actavis, LLC served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; Allergan PLC served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; Cephalon, Inc. served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; McKesson Corporation served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; Purdue Pharma Inc. served on 11/21/2017, answer due 12/12/2017; Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 11/21/2017, answer due 12/12/2017; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 11/21/2017, answer due 12/12/2017; Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (Levin, Irwin) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James D Johnson on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Johnson, James) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
11 | 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation.. (Johnson, James) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
12 | 12 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corporation ; answer due by 1/8/2018 and 1/19/2018. (Johnson, James) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
13 | 13 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information for James D. Johnson (Johnson, James) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
14 | 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela L Freel on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Freel, Angela) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 12/6/2017. (tc) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A DeLaney on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (DeLaney, Kathleen) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
17 | 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (DeLaney, Kathleen) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
18 | 18 *** FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY REFILED DOCUMENT (SEE DE#20 ) *** NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J Fitzgerald on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc (Fitzgerald, Patrick) Modified on 12/11/2017 (mtr). Modified on 12/12/2017 (mtr). [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
19 | 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by The Served Manufacturer Defendants by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J Fitzgerald on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc (Fitzgerald, Patrick) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21 ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Allergan PLC answer due 1/10/2018; Endo Health Solutions Inc answer due 1/22/2018; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc answer due 1/22/2018; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. answer due 1/10/2018; Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc answer due 1/10/2018; Mallinckrodt PLC answer due 1/10/2018; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc answer due 1/11/2018; The Purdue Frederick Company Inc answer due 1/11/2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 12/13/17. (kjp)[Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
22 | 22 CERTIFIED ORDER transferring case to Multi-District Litigation, ***Civil Case Terminated. (case electronically transferred) Signed on 12/14/17. (mlc) [Transferred from innd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
23 | 23 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Northern. Case number 2:17-cv-00431. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |