City of Fort Payne, Alabama v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45079 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 18, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 4:17-cv-01877 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:51 PM EST |
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Associated Pharmacies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Fort Payne, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:37 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 161 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L P, TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed by City of Fort Payne, Alabama.(JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 11/9/2017. (KWC) [Transferred from alnd on 12/18/2017.] | |
3 | 3 ORDER REGARDING RULE 7.1. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 05/11/2016. (KWC) [Transferred from alnd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-2970378, NDAL receipt #B4601084562. (Debrosse-Zimmermann, Diandra) Modified on 11/13/2017 (JLC). [Transferred from alnd on 12/18/2017.] | ||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL 2804: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804; Copies of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk emailed to Clerk of Court in the Northern District of Ohio. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 4:17-cv-01877. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received. |