Expro Holdings Australia 1 PTY Limited DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE. Jointly Administered under Case #17-60179-H2-11. This message does not apply to adversary proceedings or claims registers.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-60179
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-60179
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-60190 |
Case Filed: | Dec 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Expro Holdings Australia 1 PTY Limited
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago |
Saturday, May 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/12 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/12/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Final Decree (No Form)
Thu 05/10 11:30 AM
Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases Nunc Pro Tunc to February 22, 2018. . Signed on 5/8/2018 (JesusGuajardo) |
|
Sunday, December 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 12/31 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/31/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fees
Fri 12/29 9:54 AM
Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fees. The court may dismiss this case after 15 days unless the filing fee is paid or a party in interest requests a hearing (klov) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 12/22 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/21/2017. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
court
Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Submitted
Thu 12/21 4:30 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing of Bankruptcy Petition and Master Mailing List (Matrix), filed (jdav) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
court
Document
Tue 12/19 11:30 AM
An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas directing joint administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of: Expro Holdings US Inc. Case No. 17-60179 (DRJ); Exploration and Production Services (Holdings) Ltd. Case No. 17-60180 (DRJ); Expro (B) Sdn Bhd Case No. 17-60181 (DRJ); Expro Americas LLC Case No. 17-60182 (DRJ); Expro Benelux Ltd. Case No. 17-60183 (DRJ); Expro do Brasil Servicos Ltda Case No. 17-60184 (DRJ);Expro Eurasia Ltd. Case No. 17-60185 (DRJ); Expro FinServices Sarl Case No. 17-60186 (DRJ); Expro Group Australia PTY Ltd. Case No. 17-60187 (DRJ); Expro Group Canada Inc. Case No. 17-60188 (DRJ); Expro Gulf Ltd. Case No. 17-60189 (DRJ); Expro Holdings Australia 1 Pty Ltd. Case No. 17-60190 (DRJ); Expro Holdings Australia 2 Pty Ltd. Case No. 17-60191 (DRJ); Expro Holdings Norway AS Case No. 17-60192 (DRJ); Expro Holdings UK 2 Ltd Case No. 17-60193 (DRJ); Expro Holdings UK 3 Ltd. Case No. 17-60194 (DRJ); Expro Holdings UK 4 Ltd. Case No. 17-60195 (DRJ); Expro International BV Case No. 17-60196 (DRJ); Expro International Group Holdings Ltd. Case No. 17-60197 (DRJ); Expro International Group Ltd. Case No. 17-60198 (DRJ); Expro International Ltd. Case No. 17-60199 (DRJ); Expro Meters Inc. Case No. 17-60200 (DRJ); Expro North Sea Ltd. Case No. 17-60201 (DRJ); Expro Norway AS Case No. 17-60202 (DRJ); Expro Overseas Inc. Case No. 17-60203 (DRJ); Expro Overseas Ltd. Case No. 17-60204 (DRJ); Expro Resources Ltd. Case No. 17-60205 (DRJ); Expro Servicos S de R L de C.V. Case No. 17-60206 (DRJ); Expro Tool S de R L de C.V. Case No. 17-60208 (DRJ); Expro Trinidad Ltd. Case No. 17-60209 (DRJ); Expro US Finco LLC Case No. 17-60210 (DRJ); Expro US Holdings, LLC No. 17-60211 (DRJ); Expro Worldwide BV Case No. 17-60212 (DRJ); Exprotech Nigeria Ltd. Case No. 17-60213 (DRJ); Petrotech AS Case No. 17-60214 (DRJ); Petrotech BV Case No. 17-60215 (DRJ); PT Expro Indonesia Case No. 17-60216 (DRJ). All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 4 17-60179 (DRJ) |
|
4 | 4
order
Generic Order
Tue 12/19 10:51 AM
Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief Signed on 12/19/2017 (aalo) |
|
3 | 3
order
Generic Order
Tue 12/19 9:50 AM
Order for Intradistrict Transfer Signed on 12/19/2017 (aalo) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Tue 12/19 6:30 AM
|
|
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Fri 12/29 12:37 PM
Receipt Number 19618365, Fee Amount $1,717.00. (kngu) |
||
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
19
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Mon 12/18 5:10 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Expro Holdings Australia 1 PTY Limited. (Held, Michael) |