Luxembourg Residential Properties Loan Finance S.a
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:09-bk-10108 |
Case Filed: | Jan 07, 2009 |
Terminated: | Dec 15, 2016 |
Debtor
Luxembourg Residential Properties Loan Finance S.a.r.l.
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC
777 Third Avenue, 12th Floor www.epiqsystems.com
New York, NY 10017 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago |
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 01/05 11:23 AM
Affidavit of Service of Forrest Kuffer of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Application, Final Decree
Thu 12/15 3:24 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases signed on 12/15/2016 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 12/20 10:09 AM
Case Closed. (Lopez, Mary) |
||
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Application, Final Decree
Mon 12/05 5:25 PM
Application for Final Decree : Notice of Presentment of Motion for Final Decree Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Section 350(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 3022 Responses due by 12/12/2016, with presentment to be held on 12/13/2016 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC). (Marcus, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, June 02, 2014 | ||
Case Related to Case No. 14-11691 (SCC), In re: FL 6801 Spirits LLC. (Lopez, Mary). | ||
Saturday, February 01, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge James M. Peck to Judge Shelley C. Chapman. Judge Shelley C. Chapman added to the case. (Richards, Beverly). | |
Friday, January 31, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 (PLEASE DISREGARD) Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge James M. Peck to Judge Shelley C. Chapman. Judge Shelley C. Chapman added to the case. (Richards, Beverly). Modified on 1/31/2014 (Richards, Beverly). | |
Please Disregard Previously Docketed Notice of Reassignment, Entered on 1/31/2014. Judge James M. Peck is assigned to the case. (Gomez, Jessica). | ||
Wednesday, January 14, 2009 | ||
6 | 6 Order signed on 1/14/2009 Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Directing that Certain Orders and Other Pleadings Entered or Filed in the Chapter 11 Cases of Affiliated Debtors be Made Applicable to Recently Filed Cases. (Lopez, Mary) | |
5 | 5 4 pgs Order signed on 1/14/2009 Pursuant To Rule 1015(b) of The Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. The Lead Case Number is 08-13555 (JMP). (Lopez, Mary) | |
Case Joint Administration. An Order Has Been Entered In This Case Directing The Procedural Consolidation and Joint Administration of The Chapter 11 Cases of Luxembourg Residential Properties Loan Finance S.a.r.l. and BNC Mortgage LLC With All Other Cases Jointly Administered Under Case No. 08-13555 (JMP), And The Docket of Case No. 08-13555 (JMP) Should Be Consulted For All Matters Affecting This Case. (Lopez, Mary) | ||
Friday, January 09, 2009 | ||
4 | 4 Motion to Authorize : Debtors' Motion for Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Directing that Certain Orders and Other Pleadings Entered or Filed in the Chapter 11 Cases of Affiliated Debtors be Made Applicable to Luxembourg Residential Properties Loan Finance Sa.r.l. and BNC Mortgage LLC filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Luxembourg Residential Properties Loan Finance S.a.r.l.. with hearing to be held on 1/14/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 1/12/2009, (Marcus, Jacqueline) | |
3 | 3 Motion for Joint Administration : Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Requesting Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Luxembourg Residential Properties Loan Finance S.a.r.l.. with hearing to be held on 1/14/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 1/12/2009, (Marcus, Jacqueline) | |
Thursday, January 08, 2009 | ||
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 09-10108 [misc,824] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5171417. Fee amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Case Related to 08-13555 Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. (Ebanks, Liza). | ||
Wednesday, January 07, 2009 | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Luxembourg Residential Properties Loan Finance S.a.r.l.. (Perez, Alfredo) | |
1 | 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Alfredo R. Perez of Weil Gotshal & Manges on behalf of Luxembourg Residential Properties Loan Finance S.a.r.l.. (Perez, Alfredo) | |
Judge James M. Peck added to the case. (Cappiello, Karen). |