Luzerne County, Pennsylvania v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45100 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Middle, 3:17-cv-02043 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:52 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Value Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Luzerne County, Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:23 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4250197), filed by Luzerne County, Pennsylvania.(ao) [Transferred from pamd on 12/19/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Verification | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ao) [Transferred from pamd on 12/19/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Summons Packet | ||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM AND ECF REGISTRATION FORM mailed to Attorney Burton LeBlanc (lg) [Transferred from pamd on 12/19/2017.] | ||
3 | 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/9/17. (jam) [Transferred from pamd on 12/19/2017.] | |
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 STATUS REPORT regarding Service of Complaint by Luzerne County, Pennsylvania. (Ciarimboli, Edward) [Transferred from pamd on 12/19/2017.] | |
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas K. Rosenblum on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Rosenblum, Douglas) [Transferred from pamd on 12/19/2017.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc S. Raspanti on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Raspanti, Marc) [Transferred from pamd on 12/19/2017.] | |
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER 1 - Transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio per MDL Panel.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 12/14/17. (ao) [Transferred from pamd on 12/19/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Middle. Case number 3:17-cv-02043. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |