Bradley et al v. T-Mobile US, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Referred: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-07232 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Dec 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 18, 2018 2:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Amazon.com Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cox Communications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cox Media Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
T-Mobile US, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maurice Anscombe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Bradley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lura Callahan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Communications Workers Of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 07, 2021 | ||
209 | 209
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/07 4:37 PM
ORDER APPROVING 208 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA, MAURICE ANSCOMBE, LURA CALLAHAN, AND RICHARD HAYNIE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/7/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
208 | 208
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 01/06 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Maurice Anscombe, Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Communications Workers Of America, Richard Haynie (Romer-Friedman, Peter) |