County of Wayne et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45102 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 20, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Michigan Eastern, 4:17-cv-13334 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:54 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Mylan N.V. f/k/a Mylan Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
CVS Indiana LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGx LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Harvard Drug Group, LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo International plc
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
County of Wayne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County of Oakland
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:26 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6434131 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne County - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Fairfield County. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Miller, E.) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Michigan Governor Press Release, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Michigan Prescription Drug Commission, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 Increases in Drug and Opioid-Involved Overdose Deaths, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 Midwest Intervention Group, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 Heroin Use and Heroin Use Risk Behaviors among Nonmedical, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 Purdue Pharma: Corporate Fraud With a Body Count, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 Inside a Killer Drug Epidemic, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 How the Opioid Epidemic Became Americas Worst Drug Crisis Ever, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 Second Annual Opioid Abuse Presentation, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 Access Oakland, Prevent Prescription Drug Abuse, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 OxyContin goes Global, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 Systematic Review: Opioid Treatment for Chronic Back Pain, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 The Risk of a Single 5-Day Opioid Prescription, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 Opioid Painkiller Prescribing Infographic, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 Drug Distributors Penalized for Turning Blind Eye, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 16 This One-Paragraph Letter May Have Launched the Opioid Epidemic, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 17 A 5-Sentence Letter Helped Trigger Americas Deadliest Drug Overdose Crisis Ever, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 18 Who is Responsible for the Pain-Pill Epidemic?, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 19 Opioids for Chronic Pain, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 20 AAPM Facts and Figures on Pain, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 21 A Pain Drug Champion has Second Thoughts, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 22 June 8, 2012 FSMB Letter, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 23 Pain: Current Understanding of Assessment, Management, and Treatments, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 24 GAO-04-110 OxyContin Abuse and Diversion and Efforts to Address the Problem, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit 25 American Pain Foundation Shuts Down, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit 26 American Pain Foundation, Treatment Options, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit 27 Episode 1 Lets Talk Pain, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit 28 The Effectiveness and Risks of Long-Term Opioid Treatment of Chronic Pain, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit 29 Reducing the Risks of Relief, | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit 30 Opioid Abuse in Chronic Pain, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit 31 Pain: Opioid Facts, | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit 32 A Policymakers Guide to Understanding Pain & Its Management, | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit 33 Opioids for Chronic Noncancer Pain, | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit 34 Patient Advocacy Group Funded by Success of Painkiller Drugs, Probe Finds, | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit 35 Clinical Guidelines for the Use of Chronic Opioid Therapy in Chronic Noncancer Pain, | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit 36 Even Amid Crisis, Opioid Makers Plied Doctors with Perks, | ||
Att: 38 Exhibit 37 The Speakers Bureau System: A Form of Peer Selling, | ||
Att: 39 Exhibit 38 Speakers Bureaus: Best Practices for Academic Medical Centers, | ||
Att: 40 Exhibit 39 Two Leaders in Pain Treatment Have Long Ties to Drug Industry, | ||
Att: 41 Exhibit 40 Doctor: 1,500 Pills Dont Prove Smith was Addicted, | ||
Att: 42 Exhibit 41 Follow the Money: Pain, Policy, and Profit, | ||
Att: 43 Exhibit 42 Baucus and Grassley Opioid Investigation Letter to American Pain Society, | ||
Att: 44 Exhibit 43 Senators Hatch and Wyden: Do Your Jobs and Release the Sealed Opioids Report, | ||
Att: 45 Exhibit 44 Senator McCaskill Opens Investigation into Opioid Manufacturers, | ||
Att: 46 Exhibit 45 How Big Pharma got People Hooked on Dangerous Opioids and Made Tons of Money off it, | ||
Att: 47 Exhibit 46 The Promotion and Marketing of OxyContin: Commercial Triumph, Public Health Tragedy, | ||
Att: 48 Exhibit 47 Opioid Painkiller Prescribing, | ||
Att: 49 Exhibit 48 OxyContin: Purdue Pharmas Painful Medicine, | ||
Att: 50 Exhibit 49 What is the Difference between Agonist and Antagonist Drugs?, | ||
Att: 51 Exhibit 50 Dilaudid Addiction | ||
2 | 2 EXHIBIT 51-111 re1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by All Plaintiffs (Miller, E.) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 51 You Want a Description of Hell? OxyContins 12-Hour Problem, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 52 Purdue Press Release, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 53 In Guilty Plea, OxyContin Maker to Pay $600 Million, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 54 More than 1 Million OxyContin Pills Ended up in the Hands of Criminals and Addicts, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 55 Purdue Pharma Agrees to Restrict Marketing of Opioids, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 56 Safe and Effective Opioid Rotation, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 57 American Pain Foundation Organization Report, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 58 Purdue Guilty Plea, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 59 March 30, 2000 Health and Human Services Letter, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 60 September 2, 2004 Health and Human Services Letter, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 61 Finding Relief, Pain Management for Older Adults, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 62 Legal Notice, Prescribe Responsibly, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 63 Use of Opioid Analgesics in Pain Management, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 64 What a Prescriber Should Know Before Writing the First Prescription, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 65 Opana gets FDA approval despite history of abuse, limited effectiveness in trials, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 66 How A Painkiller Designed To Deter Abuse Helped Spark An HIV Outbreak, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 67 Outbreak of Recent HIV and HCV Infections Among Persons Who Inject Drugs, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 68 A.G. Schneiderman Announces Settlement with Endo Health Solutions Inc. & Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 69 In the Matter of Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Assurance, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 70 Case Challenges in Pain Management: Opioid Therapy for Chronic Pain, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 71 Understanding Your Pain: Taking Oral Opioid Analgesics, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 72 Resources for Education on Pain and Its Management: A Practitioners Compendium, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 73 AboutPainKnowledge.org, PainKnowledge, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 74 Iraq War Veteran Amputee, Pain Advocate and New Author Release Exit Wounds, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit 75 FDA requests removal of Opana ER for risks related to abuse, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit 76 Narcotic Lollipop Becomes Big Seller Despite FDA Curbs, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit 77 Cephalon, Inc., Company-Histories.com, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit 78 NDA 20-747/S-010 Letter from Cynthia McCormick, Center for Drug Evaluation and Research, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit 79 Cephalon, Inc. Annual Report (Form 10-K), | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit 80 Pharmaceutical Company Cephalon To Pay $425 Million For Off-Label Drug Marketing, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit 81 Cephalon Used Improper Tactics to Sell Drug, Prob Finds, | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit 82 Seeking Alpha, Transcript of Q1 2007 Cephalon, Inc. Earnings Conference Call, | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit 83 Public Health Advisory: Important Information for the Safe Use of Fentora, | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit 84 FENTORA (fentanyl buccal tablet) Joint Meeting of Anesthetic and Life Support Drugs, | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit 85 An Integrated Risk Evaluation and Mitigation Strategy (REMS) for Fentora and ACTIQ, | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit 86 Pharmacologic Management of Breakthrough or Incident Pain, | ||
Att: 38 Exhibit 87 Breakthrough Pain: Treatment Rationale With Opioids, | ||
Att: 39 Exhibit 88 Oral Transmucosal Fentanyl Citrate for the Treatment of Migraine Headache Pain in Outpatients, | ||
Att: 40 Exhibit 89 Optimizing Opioid Treatment for Breakthrough Pain, | ||
Att: 41 Exhibit 90 Opioid-Based Management of Persistent and Breakthrough Pain, | ||
Att: 42 Exhibit 91 The pain killer: A drug company putting profits above patients, | ||
Att: 43 Exhibit 92 In the Matter of Insyns Therapeutics, Inc., Notice of Unlawful Trade Practices, | ||
Att: 44 Exhibit 93 Doubts Raised About Off-Label Use of Subsys, a Strong Painkiller, | ||
Att: 45 Exhibit 94 Pharmaceutical Executives Charged in Racketeering Scheme, | ||
Att: 46 Exhibit 95 Insys Indictment, No. 1:16-cr-10343-ADB, Dkt No. 1, | ||
Att: 47 Exhibit 96 Mallinckrodt Announces Agreement with Xanodyne to Purchase Roxicodone, | ||
Att: 48 Exhibit 97 Pain Treatment Topics, | ||
Att: 49 Exhibit 98 Oxycodone Safety Handout for Patients, | ||
Att: 50 Exhibit 99 FAQs, Pain-Topics.org, | ||
Att: 51 Exhibit 100 Commonsense Oxycodone Prescribing & Safety, | ||
Att: 52 Exhibit 101 Donald Trumps Pick to Oversee Big Pharma Is Addicted to Opioid-Industry Cash, | ||
Att: 53 Exhibit 102 The governments struggle to hold opioid manufacturers accountable, | ||
Att: 54 Exhibit 103 Sponsors: HADs Annual Circle Sponsors, | ||
Att: 55 Exhibit 104 Opioid epidemic: ex-DEA official says Congress is protecting drug makers, | ||
Att: 56 Exhibit 105 Red Flags: Pharmacists Anti-Abuse Video, | ||
Att: 57 Exhibit 106 Mallinckrodt to Pay $35M in Deal to End Feds Opioid Probe, | ||
Att: 58 Exhibit 107 Mallinckrodt Agrees to Pay Record $35 Million Settlement for Failure to Report, | ||
Att: 59 Exhibit 108 Cardinal Health Agrees to $44 Million Settlement for Alleged Violations of Controlled Substances Act, | ||
Att: 60 Exhibit 109 AmerisourceBergen, Wikipedia, | ||
Att: 61 Exhibit 110 Drug Distribution Map, | ||
Att: 62 Exhibit 111 Drug firms poured 780M painkillers into WV amid rise of overdose | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Almonrode, Sharon) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LGra) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge John Corbett O'Meara in Ann Arbor to District Judge Robert H. Cleland in Detroit. (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Robert H. Cleland in Detroit to District Judge Matthew F. Leitman in Flint. (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Amerisourcebergen Corporation served on 10/23/2017, answer due 11/13/2017. (Miller, E.) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
8 | 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Cephalon, Inc. served on 10/20/2017, answer due 11/13/2017. (Miller, E.) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
9 | 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Insys Therapeutics, Inc. served on 10/23/2017, answer due 11/13/2017. (Miller, E.) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
10 | 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. McKesson Corporation served on 10/20/2017, answer due 11/13/2017. (Miller, E.) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
11 | 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 10/20/2017, answer due 11/13/2017. (Miller, E.) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
12 | 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 10/23/2017, answer due 11/13/2017. (Miller, E.) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian T. Smith appearing on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corporation (Smith, Brian) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
14 | 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Amerisourcebergen Corporation. (Smith, Brian) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
15 | 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wendy W. Feinstein appearing on behalf of Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Feinstein, Wendy) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
16 | 16 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Memorandum of Law in Support by Cephalon, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Feinstein, Wendy) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha M. Rich on behalf of Insys Therapeutics, Inc.. (Rich, Trisha) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
18 | 18 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Insys Therapeutics, Inc. (Rich, Trisha) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
19 | 19 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Cephalon, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Cupric Holding Co., Inc. for Cephalon, Inc.. (Feinstein, Wendy) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
20 | 20 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Orvet UK Unlimited, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., Other Affiliate Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A., Other Affiliate IVAX, LLC for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Feinstein, Wendy) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stacey A. Mahoney appearing on behalf of Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Mahoney, Stacey) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
22 | 22 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 11/16/2017 at 10:00 AM EST before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE** (HMon) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
23 | 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl A. Bush on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corporation. (Bush, Cheryl) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
24 | 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Turco on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Turco, Michael) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
25 | 25 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Brian T. Smith for on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corporation. (Smith, Brian) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
26 | 26 RESPONSE to16 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, E.) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
27 | 27 RESPONSE to14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, E.) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
28 | 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. Lienhardt on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lienhardt, Dennis) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference on 11/16/2017 is Cancelled re22 Notice to Appear. (HMon) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | ||
29 | 29 ORDER (1) Granting Defendants'16 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, (2) Terminating Defendants'14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint as Moot, and (3) Cancelling November 16, 2017, Telephonic Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
30 | 30 ORDER Approving Request for Withdrawal of Appearance of Brian T. Smith. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
31 | 31 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 10/20/2017, answer due 11/13/2017. (Miller, E.) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
32 | 32 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Endo International PLC served on 10/20/2017, answer due 11/13/2017. (Miller, E.) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
33 | 33 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Amerisourcebergen Corporation (Bush, Cheryl) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
34 | 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Williams on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corporation. (Williams, Michael) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
35 | 35 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) for MDL # 2804. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
36 | 36 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) to Northern District of Ohio for MDL # 2804. (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
37 | 37 NOTICE of Transfer to the Northern District of Ohio for MDL 2804 (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 12/20/2017.] | |
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
38 | 38 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Michigan Eastern. Case number 4:17-cv-13334. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |