People of the State of Illinois, et al v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45103 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 20, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Southern, 3:17-cv-01173 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:54 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 112, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 105, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 108, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 414, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
People of the State of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
People of Wabash County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County of Wabash
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 9:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3385142.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Lech, Thomas) [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:17-cv-1173-MJR-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kls3) [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re1 Complaint filed by People of Wabash County, County of Wabash, People of the State of Illinois. The Civil Cover Sheet attached as Attachment #1 is a fillable document. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF documents before filing on CM/ECF. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Lech on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lech, Thomas) [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory R. Jones on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jones, Gregory) [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann E. Callis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Callis, Ann) [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 10/30/2017. (rah) [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This lawsuit is one of a series of similar cases filed in this Court by Plaintiffs against the manufacturers of prescription opioids. Pursuant to the Seventh Circuit's directive in Smith v. Check-n-Go of Illinois , 200 F.3d 511, 513 (7th Cir. 1999), these cases were reassigned to the undersigned District Judge. To further the aims of preserving judicial economy and avoiding inconsistent rulings, these cases shall be assigned to a single Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, this case is hereby REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Wilkerson for such duties as are routinely carried out by the magistrate. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/31/2017. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Wills Budd on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Budd, Russell) [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Holland on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Holland, Eric) [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
11 | 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Seth Crompton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Crompton, Randall) [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 11/30/2017, answer due 1/29/2018. (Lech, Thomas) [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Cardinal Health 105, Inc., Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 11/30/2017, answer due 1/29/2018. (Lech, Thomas) [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio and MDL No. 2804 In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation.(kek) [Transferred from ilsd on 12/20/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Southern. Case number 3:17-cv-01173. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |