B.K., et al v. Thomas Betlach
Original Case: 2:15-cv-00185
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-17501 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 30, 2019 1:41 AM PDT |
Amicus Curiae
JUVENILE LAW CENTER, BLUHM LEGAL CLINIC, CENTER FOR CHILDREN'S LAW & POLICY, CENTER FOR PUBLIC REPRESENTATION, CHILDREN & FAMILY JUSTICE CENTER, CHILDREN'S ADVOCACY INSTITUTE, CHILDREN'S DEFENSE FUND-NEW YORK, CIVITAS CHILDLAW CENTER, COLUMBIA LEGAL SERVIC
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ACLU OF ARIZONA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
PRISON LAW OFFICE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ADMINISTRATIVE LAW, CIVIL PROCEDURE, AND FEDERAL COURTS PROFESSORS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
THOMAS J. BETLACH, in his official capacity as Director of the Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
B.K., by her next friend Margaret Tinsley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
B.T., by their next friend Jennifer Kupiszewski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
A.C.-B., by their next friend Susan Brandt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
M.C.-B., by their next friend Susan Brandt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
D.C.-B., by their next friend Susan Brandt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
J.M., by their next friend Susan Brandt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2019 1:38 AM PDT |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Filed order (RICHARD A. PAEZ and SANDRA S. IKUTA) in case no. 17-80211 on 12 19-2017 The motion for leave to file a reply in support of the petition for permission to appeal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(f) is granted (Docket Entry No. 3). The reply has been filed. The court, in its discretion, grants the petition for permission to appeal the district court’s September 30, 2017 order granting class action certification. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952 (9th Cir. 2005). Within 14 days after the date of this order, petitioner shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). [10696363] (RT) [Entered: 12/19/2017 03:30 PM] | |
2 | 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/26/2017. Transcript ordered by 01/18/2018. Transcript due 02/20/2018. Appellant Thomas J. Betlach opening brief due 03/29/2018. Appellees A.C.-B., B.K., B.T., D.C.-B., J.M. and M.C.-B. answering brief due 04/30/2018. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [10696365] (RT) [Entered: 12/19/2017 03:31 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Mediation Letter | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire | ||
Att: 3 9 pgs Case Opening Packet | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs Docketing Letter |