Manchester, NH, City of v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45163 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2017 |
Case in other court: | New Hampshire, 1:17-cv-00507 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:55 PM EST |
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharms, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Specialty, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
PSS World Medical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Stuart D. Baker
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Lynn Webster
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. k/n/a Hikma Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Fishman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith, LLC d/b/a H.D. Smith, f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmecuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John N. Kapoor
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt plc
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Manchester, NH, City of
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Russell Portenoy
Terminated: 03/27/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:28 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
Case assigned to Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:17-cv-507-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough North, case number 216-2017-CV-649 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1574572) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 11/9/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 11/2/2017. Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing. (Glahn, Wilbur) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2A - Summons and Complaint to Endo Health Solutions Inc. (#1 of 3), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2B - Summons and Complaint to Endo Health Solutions Inc. (#2 of 3), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2C - Summons and Complaint to Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (#3 of 3), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Glahn, Wilbur) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website[LINK:HERE] . (mc) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motion for pro hac vice admission of Joseph L. Ciaccio, Esq. has been received. Unless said motion with the required fee is filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 11/20/2017. (mc) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Suzanne Amy Spencer on behalf of Russell Portenoya Attorney Suzanne Amy Spencer added to party Russell Portenoya(pty:dft).(Spencer, Suzanne) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement 5 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to Answer to 75 Days Post Decision on 1 Notice of Removal. Text of Order: Under advisement pending a clarification from counsel. The court is unaware of any pending decision on removal. Neither the docket nor the motion provide any explanation for the decision referenced in the motion. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Delaney on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Attorney Michael A. Delaney added to party Endo Health Solutions Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A. Delaney added to party Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).(Delaney, Michael) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
5 | 5 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 75 Days Post Decision on Notice of Removal filed by Russell Portenoya. Attorney Suzanne Amy Spencer added to party Russell Portenoya(pty:dft).(Spencer, Suzanne) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David P. Slawsky on behalf of Manchester, NH, City of Attorney David P. Slawsky added to party Manchester, NH, City of(pty:pla).(Slawsky, David) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edmund J. Boutin on behalf of Janssen Pharmecuticals, Inc. Attorney Edmund J. Boutin added to party Janssen Pharmecuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).(Boutin, Edmund) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
8 | 8 Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmecuticals, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Boutin, Edmund) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian M. Quirk on behalf of Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Attorney Brian M. Quirk added to party Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).(Quirk, Brian) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
10 | 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter G. Callaghan on behalf of Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Attorney Peter G. Callaghan added to party Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).(Callaghan, Peter) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
11 | 11 Disclosure Statement by Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Callaghan, Peter) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
12 | 12 Disclosure Statement by Allergan PLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Attorney Peter G. Callaghan added to party Allergan PLC(pty:dft).(Callaghan, Peter) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
13 | 13 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to November 20, 2017 or 21 Days After Resolution of Any Motion for Remand, Whichever is Later filed by McKesson Corporation. Attorney Rose Marie Joly added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).(Joly, Rose) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
14 | 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michele E. Kenney on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corporation Attorney Michele E. Kenney added to party Amerisourcebergen Corporation(pty:dft).(Kenney, Michele) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
15 | 15 Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Corporation disclosing no parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Kenney, Michele) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
16 | 16 Assented to MOTION for Robert A. Nicholas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1577138.) filed by Amerisourcebergen Corporation.(Kenney, Michele) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Robert A. Nicholas in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
17 | 17 Assented to MOTION for Shannon E. McClure to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1577157.) filed by Amerisourcebergen Corporation.(Kenney, Michele) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Shannon E. McClure in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
18 | 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by W. Daniel Deane on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Purdue Pharma Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Purdue Pharma L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Deane, W.) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
19 | 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by W. Daniel Deane on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Deane, W.) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
20 | 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A. Vicinanzo on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. Attorney David A. Vicinanzo added to party Purdue Pharma Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Vicinanzo added to party Purdue Pharma L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Vicinanzo added to party The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Vicinanzo, David) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Reason for Reassignment: Judge Laplante recuesd. The new case designation is: 17-cv-507-AJ. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(cmp) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
21 | 21 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante recused. Case to be assigned to another judge. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
22 | 22 NOTICE of Assented to Motion to Correct Spelling of Defendant Russell Portenoy's name by Russell Portenoya.(Spencer, Suzanne) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
23 | 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S. Lewis on behalf of Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster (Special Appearances for each without waiver of jurisdiction) Attorney Michael S. Lewis added to party Perry Fine(pty:dft), Attorney Michael S. Lewis added to party Scott Fishman(pty:dft), Attorney Michael S. Lewis added to party Lynn Webster(pty:dft).(Lewis, Michael) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
24 | 24 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to1 Notice of Removal - New Case,,,, to 11/20/2017 filed by Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster.(Lewis, Michael) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
25 | 25 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties. (mc) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
26 | 26 Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Joly, Rose) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
27 | 27 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 12/26/17 filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmecuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Actavis LLC(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Actavis Pharma, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Actavis, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Allergan PLC(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Cephalon, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Endo Health Solutions Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Janssen Pharmecuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Watson Laboratories, Inc.(pty:dft).(Deane, W.) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
28 | 28 Disclosure Statement by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Deane, W.) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Assented to MOTION for Robert A. Nicholas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Robert A. Nicholas submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 11/6/2017.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Assented to MOTION for Shannon E. McClure to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Shannon E. McClure submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 11/6/2017.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 12/26/17 Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 12/26/2017. (kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
ENDORSED ORDER granting 24 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to 1 Notice of Removal - New Case to 11/20/2017. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objection on 11/20/2017. (kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to November 20, 2017 or 21 Days After Resolution of Any Motion for Remand, Whichever is Later Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 11/20/2017. (kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
29 | 29 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2017-CV-649, Hillsborough North County Superior Court(Glahn, Wilbur) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Appendix State Court Record Volume II of IV, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix State Court Record Volume III of IV, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix State Court Record Volume IV of IV | ||
30 | 30 Addendum/ to5 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 75 Days Post Decision on Notice of Removal by Russell Portenoya. (Spencer, Suzanne) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
31 | 31 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (Lewis, Michael) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
32 | 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua D. Dunlap on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corporation Attorney Joshua D. Dunlap added to party Amerisourcebergen Corporation(pty:dft).(Dunlap, Joshua) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
33 | 33 Assented to MOTION for Neil K. Roman, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1582839.) filed by McKesson Corporation.(Joly, Rose) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit of Neil K. Roman, Esq. | ||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
34 | 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel E. Will on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. Attorney Daniel E. Will added to party Cardinal Health, Inc.(pty:dft).(Will, Daniel) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
35 | 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua M. Wyatt on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. Attorney Joshua M. Wyatt added to party Cardinal Health, Inc.(pty:dft).(Wyatt, Joshua) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
36 | 36 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 30 Days After Disposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 For Coordinated or Consolidated Proceedings filed by Cardinal Health, Inc..(Will, Daniel) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
37 | 37 Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Will, Daniel) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
ENDORSED ORDER granting 33 Assented to MOTION for Neil K. Roman, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click HERE.(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
ENDORSED ORDER granting 36 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to 30 Days After Disposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 For Coordinated or Consolidated Proceedings. Text of Order: Granted. No pretrial conference will be scheduled until after Disposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Transfer. Given the issues raised in this motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
38 | 38 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster.(Lewis, Michael) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
ENDORSED ORDER granting 38 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
39 | 39 Assented to MOTION for R. Ryan Stoll to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1586041.) filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc..(Deane, W.) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A: Stoll Affidavit | ||
40 | 40 Assented to MOTION for Patrick Fitzgerald to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1586048.) filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc..(Deane, W.) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A: Fitzgerald Affidavit | ||
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
ENDORSED ORDER granting 39 Assented to MOTION for R. Ryan Stoll to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that R. Ryan Stoll submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 11/27/2017.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
ENDORSED ORDER granting 40 Assented to MOTION for Patrick Fitzgerald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Patrick Fitzgerald submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 11/27/2017.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
ENDORSED ORDER re 5 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: The clerks office shall schedule a case management conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
NOTICE of Hearing. Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2017 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
41 | 41 Assented to MOTION for Charles C. Lifland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1589790.) filed by Janssen Pharmecuticals, Inc..(Boutin, Edmund) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit (Lifland Declaration) | ||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
ENDORSED ORDER granting 41 Assented to MOTION for Charles C. Lifland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Charles C. Lifland submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 12/8/2017.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
42 | 42 Assented to MOTION for John Robinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1590754.) filed by Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster.(Lewis, Michael) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
43 | 43 Assented to MOTION for Steven Zakrzewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1590782.) filed by Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster.(Lewis, Michael) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
44 | 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Connolly on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Attorney Michael J. Connolly added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft).(Connolly, Michael) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
45 | 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher H.M. Carter on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Attorney Christopher H.M. Carter added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft).(Carter, Christopher) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
ENDORSED ORDER granting 42 Assented to MOTION for John Robinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that John Robinson submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 12/11/2017.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
ENDORSED ORDER granting 43 Assented to MOTION for Steven Zakrzewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Steven Zakrzewski submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all conditions required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 12/11/2017.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
Deadlines terminated. Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2017 02:30 PM before Andrea K. Johnstone is CANCELED. (kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
46 | 46 ORDER MDL No. 2 re: Conditional transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Stay is lifted as no objection to the transfer was filed with the Panel. MDL 2804. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/16/2018. (kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
Civil Case Terminated. (kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
47 | 47 ORDER MDL FINAL ORDER. Case is transferred to Northern District of Ohio for proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407. MDL No. 2804. (kad) [Transferred from nhd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
48 | 48 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Hampshire. Case number 1:17-cv-00507. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |