TOWNSHIP OF IRVINGTON v. PURDUE PHARMA L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45156 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2017 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 2:17-cv-12155 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:56 PM EST |
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
TEVA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES (1-100)
|
|
Defendant
JANE DOES 1 THROUGH 100,
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ENDO PHARMACEUTIALS INC.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Plaintiff
Township of Irvington
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:00 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) [Transferred from njd on 12/21/2017.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8286911) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TOWNSHIP OF. IRVINGTON.(CECCHI, JAMES) [Transferred from njd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACTAVIS INC., ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC., ACTAVIS PLC, ALLERGAN PLC, CARDINAL HEALTH INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTIALS INC., INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., TEVA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, WATSON LABORATORIES INC., WATSON PHARMA INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Reilly* (jr) [Transferred from njd on 12/21/2017.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re1 Complaint [Correcting Signature Block] (CECCHI, JAMES) [Transferred from njd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by TOWNSHIP OF IRVINGTON.(CECCHI, JAMES) [Transferred from njd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 CTO #1 transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio (MDL #2804) In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation (gh, ) [Transferred from njd on 12/21/2017.] | |
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Jersey. Case number 2:17-cv-12155. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |