Johnson v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Donovan W Frank |
Referred: | Becky R Thorson |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-05548 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Dec 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 20, 2018 4:19 AM CDT |
Defendant
Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
![]() JUDGMENT(kt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/20/2018. (las) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
![]() PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re19 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
19 | 19
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Donna Johnson. Jointly Signed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing
Tue 10/23 3:45 PM
(Text-only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: Per counsel, the matter has settled and a Stipulation for Dismissal will be filed. The settlement conference set for November 1, 2018, before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson is canceled. (MSK) |
|
17 | 17
![]() LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Donna Johnson . (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/6/2018. (MSK) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Order for Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 4/4/2018. (MSK) |
|
14 | 14
![]() ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 7/2/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 7/2/2018. Motions (non-disp) due 7/23/2018. Motions (disp) due by 2/15/2019. Ready for trial due by 7/15/2019. Telephone Conference set for 8/6/2018 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 4/4/2018. (MSK) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/4/2018. (MSK) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Donna Johnson. Jointly Signed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Operana, Brandon) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson.(MMP) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Hartford Life, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Hartford Holdings, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Primack, Stuart) |
|
9 | 9
![]() ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Primack, Stuart) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart F. Primack on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Primack, Stuart) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/20 12:57 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stuart F. Primack for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/20/2018. (AKL) |
|
Monday, February 19, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stuart F Primack. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5966617 filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Huhta, Adam) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S Huhta on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Huhta, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Donna Johnson. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/27/2017, answer due 2/26/2018. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (ACH) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Tue 12/26 9:50 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 17-cv-5548 DWF/BRT. (ACH) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-5879675) filed by Donna Johnson. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |