New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa G Beckerman
Case #: 1:17-bk-13633
Case Filed:Dec 26, 2017
Creditor Meeting:Jun 04, 2020
Claims Deadline:May 03, 2021
Converted:Feb 18, 2020
Discharge Objection Deadline:Aug 03, 2020

Debtor
Robert Francis Xavier Sillerman
151 E 72nd St
New York, NY 10021-4300
Represented By
Laurie Binder
Rosen & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Sanford Philip Rosen
Rosen & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Paris Gyparakis
Paris Gyparakis, Esq.
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors, Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Thomas R. Slome
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Jil Mazer-Marino
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
React Presents, Inc.
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Clubtix, Inc.
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Lucas King
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Jeffrey Callahan
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Trustee
Yann Geron
Yann Geron Geron Legal Advisors LLC 370 Lexington Avenue Suite 1101
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Fred Stevens
Klestadt Winters Jureller
contact info
Elizabeth Usinger
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Yann Geron
Yann Geron
contact info
Sean C. Southard
Klestadt Winters Jureller Southard
contact info
Lauren Catherine Kiss
Klestadt Winters Jureller
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014
Represented By
Richard C. Morrissey
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info

GPO Oct 08 2019
Memorandum Opinion and Order signed on 10/8/2019 Granting Motion to Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee (related document(s)404). (Gomez, Jessica)

Docket last updated: 07/15/2022 1:12 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 26, 2017
Receipt of Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-13633 [misc,826] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12355456. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
1 1 Involuntary Petition Against Individual (Chapter 7) (Fee Amount $ 335.) Against: Robert Francis Xavier Sillerman. Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): React Presents, Inc. (attorney Michael James Edelman), Clubtix, Inc. (attorney Michael James Edelman), Lucas King (attorney Michael James Edelman), Jeffrey Callahan (attorney Michael James Edelman). (Edelman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons