Wind v. Correct Care Solutions et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis T Babcock |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03122 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Statement
Tue 03/19 10:31 AM
Inmate Account STATEMENT by Plaintiff Gregory Carl Wind, Jr. (sphil, ) |
|
Friday, November 23, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Statement
Fri 11/23 3:26 PM
Inmate Trust Account STATEMENT by the Adams County Detention Facility for by Plaintiff Gregory Carl Wind, Jr. (evana, ) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Tue 09/18 12:42 PM
Letter from The Adams County Sheriff's Department re: Inmate Account Statement for Gregory Carl Wind, Jr. (evana, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Statement
Thu 08/16 11:42 AM
Letter from Adams County Sheriff's Office re: Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Gregory Carl Wind, Jr. (agarc, ) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Tue 06/26 9:42 AM
LETTER by Plaintiff Gregory Carl Wind, Jr. (angar, ) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Mon 06/11 1:57 PM
LETTER re Statements from Adams County Detention Facility (angar, ) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Pro Se survey deadline
Fri 03/09 2:14 PM
JUDGMENT re:11 Order of Dismissal by Clerk on 3/9/2018. Pro Se Survey to be mailed by 4/16/2018 (angar, ) |
|
11 | 11
4
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 03/09 2:11 PM
ORDER of Dismissal. Leave to proceed in forma paupers on appeal isdenied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/9/2018. (angar, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 03/12 9:55 AM
***Set/Reset Deadlines: Pro Se Survey to be mailed by 4/13/2018. (dkals, ) |
||
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Tue 02/13 2:46 PM
LETTER by Plaintiff Gregory Carl Wind, Jr. (angar, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel
Thu 02/01 9:55 AM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order within the time allowed the Court will dismiss the action without further notice. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel, ECF No.7 , is denied without prejudice at this time. This case remains under review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(b). Plaintiff may refile the motion after the initial review is completed, if the case is not dismissed, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/31/2018. (angar, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 01/30 4:16 PM
ORDER Granting3 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/30/2018. (angar, ) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appoint Pro Bono Counsel
Fri 01/19 11:09 AM
Prisoner MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Plaintiff Gregory Carl Wind, Jr. (angar, ) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Tue 01/09 2:01 PM
LETTER re:4 Order Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies by Plaintiff Gregory Carl Wind, Jr. (agarc, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Tue 01/09 2:00 PM
LETTER re: Prisoner Account Statement by Plaintiff Gregory Carl Wind, Jr. (agarc, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 12/27 10:19 AM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order , the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/26/2017. (angar, ) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 12/26 11:53 AM
Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Gregory Carl Wind, Jr. (cthom, ) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 12/26 9:14 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/26 9:01 AM
Prisoner COMPLAINT against Susan Argo, Correct Care Solutions, filed by Gregory Carl Wind, Jr.(rvill, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |