IN RE: Bank of America Corp.
Original Case: 1:09-md-02058
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-cv-01830 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2013 |
Terminated: | Nov 05, 2014 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 18, 2015 1:01 PM EDT |
Defendant
Peter Kraus
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gary A. Carlin
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nelson Chai
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kenneth D. Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John A. Thain
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Frank P. Bramble, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John T. Collins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
William Barnet, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gary L. Countryman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Tommy R. Franks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Charles K. Gifford
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Monica C. Lozano
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Walter E. Massey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Thomas J. May
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Patricia E. Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Thomas M. Ryan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Meredith R. Spangler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Robert L. Tillman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jackie M. Ward
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Neil A. Cotty
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Joe L. Price
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Banc of America Securities L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
J. Steele Alphin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Amy Woods Brinkley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Barbara J. Desoer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Liam E. McGee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Timothy J. Mayopoulos
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Brian T. Moynihan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bruce L. Hammonds
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Richard K. Struthers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee Defendants
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America Compensation and Benefits Committee Defendants
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Keith T. Banks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Teresa Brenner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Carol T. Christ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Armando M. Codina
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Virgis W. Colbert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gregory Curl
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John D. Finnegan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gregory Fleming
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Fox-Pitt Kelton Cochran Caronia Waller (USA) L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
J.C. Flowers & Co., L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Judith Mayhew Jonas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Aulana L. Peters
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph W. Prueher
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ann N. Reese
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Michael Ross
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Charles O. Rossotti
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Peter Stingi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Thomas K. Montag
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kenneth D. Davis
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Martin I. Fineberg
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kenneth A. Lewis
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph L. Price
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., 4 World Financial Cneter, New York, NY 10080
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jeremy Fineberg
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
O. Temple Sloan, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Objector - Appellant
Orloff Family Trust DTD 10/3/91
|
Represented By
|
Objector - Appellant
Orloff Family Trust DTD 12/31/01
|
Represented By
|
Objector - Appellant
St. Stephen, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Public Pension Funds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
The Public Pension Fund Group
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Steven J. Sklar, as (IRA Account Beneficiary), on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Rhonda Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Alma Alvarez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Michael R. Bahnmaier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Mark Adams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Elizabeth Eagen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Vernon C. Dailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Richard Adame
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Arlene Kahn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Petra Chatman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Grant Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
New York State Teachers' Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Public Employees' Retirement Association of Colorado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Steve R. Graber, Individually, as assignee of claims of the SRG 2008 Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Schwab 1000 Index Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Schwab Institutional Select S&P 500 Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Schwab Dividend Equity Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Schwab Core Equity Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Schwab Premier Equity Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Schwab Fundamental US Large Company Index Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Schwab S&P 500 Index Portfolio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Schwab Markettrack Growth Portfolio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Schwab Markettrack Balanced Portfolio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Schwab Investments
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Schwab Capital Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Dr. Salomon Melgen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Flor Melgen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SFM Holdings Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
International Fund Management, S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Deka International S.A. Luxemburg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Deka Investment GmbH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
DI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Aaron Katz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Joel Katz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Sylvia Weissmann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Parker Family Investments, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Jeffrey R. Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
The 1997 Jeffrey R. Parker Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Drew E. Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
The 1994 Drew E. Parker Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Keith D. Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Julie M. Sorin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
The 1991 Jeffrey R. Parker Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
The 1994 Julie P. Mantell Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Michael A. Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Mark D. Wender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Elliot Wender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Penina Wender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Stanley L. Wender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Razelle M. Wender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Jill W. Goldstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Jerry E. Finger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Ambassador Life Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Select Investors Exchange Fund, L.P.
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Richard Finger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JEF Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
1976 Real Estate Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Walter Finger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
The Jerry E. Finger Family Trust D/T/D 12/28/1989
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
The Jerry E. Finger Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Leo R. Jalenak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Peggy E. Jalenak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
KERS & Co.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Robert Gegnas, 198 Locha Drive, Jupiter, FL 334587752
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Steven L. Shapiro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Harvey M. Mitnick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Nathan A. Friedman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Bonnie Friedman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Kenneth A. Ciullo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Joanna Ciullo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Thomas P. DiNapoli, Comptroller of the State of New York, as Administrative Head of The New York State and Local Retirement Systems and as Sole Trustee of The New York State Common Retirement Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Schwab Financial Services Fund
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 05 2014
OPINION, affirming the judgment of the district court approving the settlement, per curiam (RKW, BDP, PWH), FILED.[1362516] [13-1798, 13-1830, 13-1853] |
Docket last updated: 09/05/2015 1:18 AM EDT |
Thursday, May 09, 2013 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Orloff Family Trust DTD 10/3/91, Orloff Family Trust DTD 12/31/01 and St. Stephen, Inc., FILED. [934167] 13-1830 [Entered: 05/10/2013 02:40 PM] | |
2 | 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Orloff Family Trust DTD 10/3/91, Orloff Family Trust DTD 12/31/01 and St. Stephen, Inc., district court docket entry re: receipt # 02088493296, FILED.[934178] 13-1830 [Entered: 05/10/2013 02:43 PM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/09/2013, RECEIVED.[934182] 13-1830 [Entered: 05/10/2013 02:44 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[934186] 13-1830 [Entered: 05/10/2013 02:45 PM] |