Victor Lopez v. Nintendo of America Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-10146 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 26, 2018 4:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
Nintendo of America Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Victor Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER: It has been reported to the Court that this case has been settled in principle. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. Any application to reopen this action must be filed within thirty (30) days of this order, and any application filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. If the parties seek to have the Court retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement, the terms of the agreement must be placed on the public record and "so ordered" by the Court within the same thirty-day period. See Hendrickson v. United States, 791 F.3d 354, 358 (2d Cir. 2015). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/01/2018) (ama) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Victor Lopez. (Marks, Bradly) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER: In light of the parties' failure to timely submit their pre-conference materials, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for April 27, 2018, is adjourned until further notice. The parties shall submit a joint letter to the Court on the status of the case and of their settlement negotiations no later than April 30, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/24/2018) (rj) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER: granting11 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pretrial conference is rescheduled for April 27, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall submit their pre-conference materials no later than April 20, 2018. Initial Conference set for 4/27/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/20/2018) (ap) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Bradly G. Marks, Esq. dated March 19, 2018. Document filed by Victor Lopez.(Marks, Bradly) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:9 Letter filed by Victor Lopez. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The initial pretrial conference is rescheduled for March 26, 2018, at 3:30 p.m. All preconference materials identified in this Court's order at Dkt. 7 shall be submitted one week in advance of the conference. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 3/26/2018 at 03:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/16/2018) (anc) |
|
9 | 9
![]() FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Joint request dated February 16, 2018 re: Request for extension and adjourn. Document filed by Victor Lopez.(Marks, Bradly) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Nintendo of America Inc. served on 1/22/2018, answer due 2/12/2018. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougerty, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Victor Lopez. (Marks, Bradly) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/1/2018 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by February 23, 2018, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs as set forth in this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by February 23, 2018, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. A template for the order is available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Abrams. The status letter and the proposed case management plan should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with Section 13.1 of the Court's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) Rules & Instructions, available at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf/ecf _rules_ 080113.pdf. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendant with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/12/2018) (rj) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 01/12 1:11 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 3/1/2018 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (arc) |
||
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nintendo of America Inc. (vf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 12/29 10:59 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Bradly Gurion Marks. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Victor Lopez. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 12/29 11:02 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 12/29 11:03 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 12/29 11:03 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC., re:4 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Victor Lopez And On Behalf Of All Other Persons Similarly Situated. (Marks, Bradly) |
|
4 | 4
![]() FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Nintendo of America Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Victor Lopez And On Behalf Of All Other Persons Similarly Situated. Related document:1 Complaint.(Marks, Bradly) |
|
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Victor Lopez And On Behalf Of All Other Persons Similarly Situated. (Marks, Bradly) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marks, Bradly) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Nintendo of America Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14520057)Document filed by Victor Lopez And On Behalf Of All Other Persons Similarly Situated.(Marks, Bradly) |