SMITH v. MAHALLY et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gene Ek Pratter |
Referred: | Elizabeth T Hey |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-05809 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2018 |
Petitioner
CHRISTOPHER SMITH
|
|
Respondent
DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA
|
|
Respondent
LAWRENCE P. MAHALLY
|
|
Respondent
THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 04/01 2:11 PM
ORDER of USCA as to15 Notice of Appeal filed by CHRISTOPHER SMITH THAT THE APPLICATION FOR A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILTY IS DENIED. (jpd, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Remark
Wed 01/02 2:17 PM
RECEIPT OF STATE COURT RECORD SIGNED BY JUDGE PRATTER CHAMBERS ON 1/2/19. (jaa, ) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
misc
Remark
Fri 12/28 4:32 PM
STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED ON 12/28/18 FROM THE THIRD CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS AND FORWARDED TO THE CHAMBERS OF THE HONORABLE JUDGE GENE E.K. PRATTER. (jpd, ) |
||
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
misc
Remark
Mon 11/19 3:56 PM
RECEIPT OF STATE COURT RECORD ON 11/19/18 FROM THE CHAMBERS OF THE HONORABLE JUDGE GENE E.K. PRATTER AND FORWARDED TO THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE THIRD CIRCUIT. (jpd, ) |
||
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Fri 11/09 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re15 Notice of Appeal filed by CHRISTOPHER SMITH. USCA Case Number 18-3465 (dmc, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 11/05 2:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to14 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, by CHRISTOPHER SMITH. FILING FEE NOT PAID Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. (jpd, ) Modified on 11/5/2018 (lisad, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Thu 09/27 11:54 AM
|
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice re: Report and Recommendation
Tue 05/08 12:14 PM
***(Court Only) Civ624 Notice to the Court regarding Report and Recommendation.(jpd, ) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Tue 05/08 11:55 AM
PETITIONER CHRISTOPHER SMITH 'S OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd, ) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Remark
Thu 04/19 4:15 PM
RECEIPT OF STATE COURT RECORD ON 4/19/18 BY THE CHAMBERS OF THE HONORABLE JUDGE GENE E.K. PRATTER FROM THE CHAMBERS OF THE HONORABLE ELIZABETH T. HEY, UNITED STATED MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (jpd, ) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 04/19 12:58 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEA CORPUS BE DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY FILED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 4/19/18. 4/19/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER AND E-MAILED. (jpd ) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Civ 623 | ||
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Response
Mon 03/05 9:24 AM
PETITIONER CHRISTOPHER SMITH'S TRAVERSE AND RESPONSE, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd, ) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Fri 02/16 10:20 AM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA, LAWRENCE P. MAHALLY, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA.(SCALERA, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Superior Court Opinion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ct. Comm. Pleas Docket | ||
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Answer Deadline
Tue 02/13 12:02 PM
ORDER THAT THE RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT A RESPONSE TO THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY 2/16/2018 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 2/12/18. 2/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER AND E-MAILED. (jpd) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 02/09 3:59 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,5 Memorandum filed by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA, LAWRENCE P. MAHALLY, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to ELIZABETH T. HEY.(SCALERA, MICHAEL) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
30+
pgs
respoth
Memorandum
Thu 02/01 12:49 PM
PETITIONER CHRISTOPHER SMITH'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. (jpd, ) |
|
Att: 1 pt 1, | ||
Att: 2 pt 2 | ||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Remark
Thu 01/25 10:08 AM
REECEIPT OF STATE COURT RECORD ON 1/19/18 BY THE CHAMBERS OF THE HONROABLE ELIZABETH T. HEY, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (jpd, ) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
misc
State Court Record - Prisoner
Thu 01/18 11:36 AM
STATE COURT RECORD RECIVED ON 1/18/18 FROM THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY AND FORWARDED TO THE CHAMBERS OF THE HONORABLE ELIZABETH T. HEY, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (jpd, ) |
||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order for Prisoner State Record
Wed 01/10 2:31 PM
ORDER THAT THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADLEPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWERS WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THE CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADLEPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, POST CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH v. SMITH, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA, CP-51-CR-1115931-1991 WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. PRISONER STATE RECORD DUE BY 2/9/2018. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 1/10/18. 1/10/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER, E-MAILED TO THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA, CERTIFIED MAIL TO THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PHILADELPHIA AND HARRISBURG AND DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA AND FAXED TO CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. (jpd ) |
|
misc
Remark
Wed 01/10 2:36 PM
COPY OF ORDER, PETITION AND DOCKET SHEET E-MAILED TO THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA AND CERTIFIED MAIL TO THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PHILADELPHIA AND HARRISBURG. (jpd,) |
||
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 01/10 9:29 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE OF PHILADELPHIA WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/9/18. 1/10/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER, E-MAILED TO D.A.-PHILADELPHIA COUNTY.(pr, ) |
|
misc
Remark
Wed 01/10 9:33 AM
E-mailed petition, docket, and order dated 1/9/18 to D.A.-Philadelphia County. (pr, ) |
||
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 12/29 11:52 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 171125.), filed by CHRISTOPHER SMITH.(tj, ) (tj, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheets | ||
Att: 2 (12/29/2017) Envelope-Small, | ||
Att: 3 (12/29/2017) Envelope-Side 1, | ||
Att: 4 (12/29/2017) Envelope-Side 2 |