Michael T. Senner v. J Gastelo
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Consuelo B Marshall |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-02251 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Dec 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)
Tue 02/13 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, ORDERING Proof of Service submitted by Petitioner Michael T. Senner received on 1/16/18 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: This case was closed on 1/10/18. (yl) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 01/16 9:46 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, in favor of J Gastelo against Michael T. Senner Related to: Order Dismissing Case, Order on Petition for Certificate of Appealability3 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (ec) |
|
3 | 3
order
Dismissing Case Certificate of Appealability - Order of USDC
Tue 01/16 9:44 AM
ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AS SECOND OR SUCCESSIVE; DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY; AND REFERRING PETITION PURSUANT TO NINTH CIRCUIT RULE 22-3(a)r by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (ec) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form
Fri 12/29 9:50 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (jtil) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
Fri 12/29 9:37 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254), filed by Petitioner Michael T. Senner. Case assigned to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil) |