Scott County Fiscal Court v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45173 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 5:17-cv-00474 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:56 PM EST |
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Scott County Fiscal Court
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:28 PM EDT |
Saturday, December 02, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-3951305), filed by Scott County Fiscal Court.(VA) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
Conflict Check run. (VA) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2017.] | ||
2 | 2 STANDING ORDER: 1. Clerk is DIRECTED to ASSIGN all matters related to case Anderson County Fiscal Court v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation to Judge Van Tatenhove; 2. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 09/22/2017.(VA)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
Clerk's Note re1 Complaint: Clerk has forwarded to MDL Panel (cc: SKV), via email the Complaint and Docket Sheet on possible tag-along action to National Prescription Opiate Litigation MDL 2804. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2017.] | ||
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K. Phillips on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2017.] | |
5 | 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2017.] | |
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 (STC) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2017.] | |
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFIED ORDER received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 2 filed in MDL Case Number 2804 (STC)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2017.] | |
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 5:17-cv-00474. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |