Original Case: 2:11-cv-12557

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:13-cv-01773
Typecivil / private / federal question
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2013
Terminated:May 14, 2014
Last checked: Monday Jan 11, 2016 1:31 AM CST
Amicus Curiae
BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE MICHIGAN REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS EMPLOYEE BENEFIT FUND
Represented By
Ronald Scott Lederman
Sullivan, Ward, Asher & Patton
contact info
Gerard J. Andree
Sullivan, Ward, Asher & Patton
contact info
Amicus Curiae
BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL UNION NO. 80 INSURANCE TRUST FUND
Represented By
Ronald Scott Lederman
Sullivan, Ward, Asher & Patton
contact info
Gerard J. Andree
Sullivan, Ward, Asher & Patton
contact info
Amicus Curiae
SECRETARY OF LABOR
Represented By
Robin Springberg Parry
U.S. Department of Labor
contact info
Defendant - Appellant Cross-Appellee
BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN
Represented By
Rebecca D'Arcy O'Reilly
RDO Benefits Counsel
contact info
Matthew Ryan Rechtien
Bodman
contact info
Gregory Christopher Bernard
Bodman
contact info
James J. Walsh
Bodman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee Cross-Appellant
HI-LEX AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
Stephen Fisher MacGuidwin
Michigan Health Lawyers
contact info
Perrin Rynders
Varnum
contact info
Aaron M. Phelps
Varnum
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee Cross-Appellant
HI-LEX CONTROLS, INC.
Represented By
Stephen Fisher MacGuidwin
Michigan Health Lawyers
contact info
Perrin Rynders
Varnum
contact info
Aaron M. Phelps
Varnum
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee Cross-Appellant
HI-LEX CORPORATION HEALTH AND WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN
Represented By
Stephen Fisher MacGuidwin
Michigan Health Lawyers
contact info
Perrin Rynders
Varnum
contact info
Aaron M. Phelps
Varnum
contact info

GPO May 14 2014
OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : The judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED. Decision for publication. Damon J. Keith, Eugene E. Siler, Jr. (AUTHORING), and John M. Rogers, Circuit Judges. [13-1773, 13-1859]

Docket last updated: 01/11/2016 1:31 AM CST
Monday, June 10, 2013
The case manager for this case is: Cheryl Borkowski (CB)
Related: [-]
Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan. Transcript needed: y. (CB)
Related: [-]