Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:17-cr-02515
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Jan 06, 2018 1:29 AM CST
Defendant
Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria (1)
Represented By
David Joseph Kimmelman
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Noemi Vania Lopez
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/06/2018 1:55 AM CST
Thursday, November 09, 2017
Arrest of Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria (mg2) [3:17-mj-04881-ATB]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2017
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND SET as to Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria by Judge Anne T. Berton. (mg2) [3:17-mj-04881-ATB]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton as to Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria. (mg2) [3:17-mj-04881-ATB]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria. (mg2) [3:17-mj-04881-ATB]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (mg2) [3:17-mj-04881-ATB]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne T. Berton:Initial Appearance as to Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria held on 11/13/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria (Court Reporter ERO.) (mg2) [3:17-mj-04881-ATB]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria, ( Detention Hearing set for 11/16/2017 10:30 AM before Judge Anne T. Berton,, Preliminary Hearing set for 11/16/2017 10:30 AM before Judge Anne T. Berton,). Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (mg2) [3:17-mj-04881-ATB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2017
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Noemi Vania Lopez appearing for USA. . Attorney Noemi Vania Lopez added to party USA(pty:pla) (Lopez, Noemi) [3:17-mj-04881-ATB]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Joseph Kimmelman appearing for Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria . Attorney David Joseph Kimmelman added to party Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria(pty:dft) (Kimmelman, David) [3:17-mj-04881-ATB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
8 8 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria (Kimmelman, David) [3:17-mj-04881-ATB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2017
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION: DETAINED WITHOUT BOND as to Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (ec) [3:17-mj-04881-ATB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2017
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (mn)
Related: [-]
10 10 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria (1) count(s) 1. (mn)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Jose Luis Mejia-Echeverria (mn)
Related: [-]