California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 4:18-cv-00124
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2018
Terminated:Mar 22, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 04, 2018 2:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Anthony Levandowski
Represented By
Harmeet K. Dhillon
Dhillon Law Group Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Erika Wong
Represented By
Nathaniel Dale Sterling
Sterling Law Firm
contact info


1. Nanny files lawsuit against former Uber engineer Anthony Levandowski (social.techcrunch.com)
Submitted Wed 01/17/2018
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, January 08, 2018
5 5 Summons Issued as to Anthony Levandowski. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/19/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 01/05 5:44 PM
Proposed Summons. (Sterling, Nathaniel) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/05 4:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Anthony Levandowski ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12001994.). Filed byErika Wong.(Sterling, Nathaniel) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet