Original Case: 6:11-cv-01332

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:13-prici-12794
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2013
Terminated:Sep 17, 2014
Last checked: Saturday Sep 05, 2015 12:09 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF OAK HILL, FLORIDA
Represented By
Joseph R. Flood Jr.
Dean Ringers Morgan & Lawton, PA
contact info
Jessica Christy Conner
Dean Ringers Morgan & Lawton, PA
contact info
Joshua B. Walker
Dean Ringers Morgan & Lawton, PA
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GUY GRASSO, Chief, As Chief of the Oak Hill, Florida Police Department
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL IHNKEN, Sergeant, in his official and individual capacity
Represented By
Robert E. Bonner
Meier Bonner Muszynski O'Dell & Harvey, PA
contact info
David R. Lane
Meier Bonner Muszynski O'Dell & Harvey, PA
contact info
Defendant - Appellee-Cross Appellant
SHANE CHANDLER, Officer, in his official and individual capacity
Represented By
Robert E. Bonner
Meier Bonner Muszynski O'Dell & Harvey, PA
contact info
David R. Lane
Meier Bonner Muszynski O'Dell & Harvey, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
WILLIAM SMITH
Represented By
Carlus Haynes
Haynes & Laurent
contact info
Bradley Laurent
Haynes & Laurent
contact info

GPO Sep 17 2014
Opinion issued by court as to Appellant-Cross Appellee William Smith. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. (13-12822X)

Docket last updated: 09/05/2015 12:09 AM EDT
Thursday, June 20, 2013
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant William Smith on 06/14/2013. Fee Status: Fee Paid.
Related: [-]